Nuno Velasco v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Juan Alfonso Nuno Velasco
Respondent: Rene Baker and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2013cv00431
Filed: August 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER that Nuno Velasco's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ECF No. 47 is denied; Clerk directed to enter judgment accordingly; a certificate of appealability is denied; respondents' motion for an extension of time ECF No. 68 is granted nunc pro tunc as of 05/17/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 09/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying ECF No. 51 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss; respondents will have until 04/16/2017 to answer the remaining claims in the petition, if they have not done so already; Petitioner will have 45 days from the dat e on which the answer is served to file a reply; granting nunc pro tunc as of 10/10/2016 ECF No. 63 Respondents' Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 03/02/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting 30 motion for reconsideration; vacating 29 Order; and denying without prejudice 17 motion for leave to conduct discovery. Verified petition due within 90 days. Response due 45 days after service of petition. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting Respondents' 31 Emergency Motion to Quash Subpoenas; directing Clerk to serve this order on the following entities (see order for details; mailed 5/8/2015). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/8/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER - P's # 17 Motion for discovery is granted. P is granted leave to serve subpoenas. P is granted leave to propound discovery requests. P's request to hire an investigator is granted as specified. Rs' # 21 Motion to strike is den ied. The parties shall endeavor in good faith to resolve any and all discovery disputes. P's (# 20 at 4) Motion to extend time to file an amended petition is granted. Rs' # 25 Motion to extend time to respond to amended petition is granted. Discovery due by 6/25/2015. Amended petition due by 7/25/2015. Answer to amended petition due 30 days after service thereof. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 27, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting 14 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner's amended petition due by 6/4/2014. Respondents' response to the amended petition due by 7/7/2014. Petitioner's reply due by 8/6/2014. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 02/27/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER releasing the FPD and appointing CJA attorney Jeffrey S. Blanck as counsel for petitioner. The clerk shall electronically serve Mr. Blanck with a copy of this order and the petition for writ of habeas corpus and its attachments (e-served 11/12 /2013). Mr. Blanck shall have 60 days to file a notice of appearance or indicate his inability to represent petitioner (due by 1/11/2014). The clerk shall send a copy of this order to the CJA Coordinator (e-served 11/12/2013). After counsel has appeared for petitioner in this case, the Court will issue a scheduling order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 30, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Clerk shall E-serve FPD with a copy of this order and the petition 1 -1 and attachments. (E-service performed 9/30/2013.) FPD shall have until 10/302013 to undertake direct representation of petitioner or indicate to Court its inability to represent petitioner in these proceedings. Further ordered Clerk shall send a copy this order to the CJA Coordinator. (E-service of NEF performed 9/30/2013.) Further ordered that after counsel has appeared for petitioner the court will issue a scheduling order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 9/30/2013 to reflect manual service to P at ESP on 9/30/2013 (DRM).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nuno Velasco v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rene Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Juan Alfonso Nuno Velasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?