Robben v. Carson City, Nevada et al

Plaintiff: Todd Robben
Defendant: Carson City, Nevada, Department of Alternative Sentencing, Martin Hale, Travis Lucia, Doctor Joseph E McEllistrem, Rory Planeta, Neil Rombardo, Kate Summers and Judge John Tatro
Case Number: 3:2013cv00438
Filed: August 14, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 19, 2016 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Plaintiff Todd Robbens Motions to Stay Proceedings are GRANTED. These are the following docket numbers: ECF Nos. 120 and 127 in case no. 3:13-cv-0438-RFB-VPC; ECF Nos. 27 and 32 in case no. 3:15-cv-0529-RFB-VPC; and E CF Nos. 33 and 38 in case no. 3:15-cv-0530-RFB-VPC. FURTHER ORDERED that these cases are STAYED for 60 days. All pending deadlines are suspended during the stay. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Todd Robben shall file a status report on or before June 20, 2016 informing the Court of the status of his criminal proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 11, 2016 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that Plaintiff Todd Robben's Emergency # 107 Ex Parte Motion to Reconsider is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. FURTHER ORDERED that the hearing and oral argument set for March 21, 2016 is RESET to Monday, March 21, 2016 at 10: 00 A.M. in Reno Courtroom [to be determined]. The Court will issue a further Order specifying the courtroom for the hearing. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Todd Robben's # 108 Notice regarding inability to attend March 21 hearing is DENIED. Plaintiff Todd Robben shall be permitted to enter the Reno courthouse for his scheduled hearing on March 21, 2016 by identifying himself by first and last name and case numbers. Other than this, he will be subject to all other security and screening procedures for the federal courthouse. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 17, 2016 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 102 Order filed February 11, 2016 : Plaintiff is authorized to file electronically in the case 3:13-cv-00438-RFB-VPC, and may contact Robert Johnson at CM/ECF Help Desk at (702) 464-5555 in order to obtain access to his CM/ECF account. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 11, 2016 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 95 Emergency Ex Parte Motion to Waive PACER Costs and Fees is GRANTED with the following provisions: (1) On or before February 24, 2016, Plaintiff must provide certification that he has completed the CM/ECF tutorial and is familiar with the Electronic Filing Procedures, Best Practices and the Civil Events Menu that are accessible on this Court's website; and (2) Plaintiff is not authorized to file electronically unless and until the certification is filed with the Court w ithin the time frame specified. Once he does so, Plaintiff may register as a CM/ECF filing user on the Court's website. The Court also notes that Plaintiff has requested electronic access to other cases: 3:15-cv- 00529 and 3:15-cv-530. Plaint iff is instructed that this Order granting him permission to file on CM/ECF is applicable only to this case. If he wishes to obtain permission on his other cases, he must file a motion in those cases. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 24, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 48 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order; denying 49 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Pleadings; denying 50 Motion for Discovery; denying 58 Motion to Strike; and granting 59 Motion to Strike. Clerk is directed to strike 52 Plaintiff's proposed amended complaint. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 19, 2015 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to Defendants Tatro, Rombardo, and Lucia. Defendants granted leave to file renewed motion for summary judgment, within 15 days, and address effect of Dismissal Order on Plaintiff's claims. Plaintiff's motion to strike 38 is denied. Clerk directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants Tatro, Rombardo, and Lucia. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 11, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 2/11/2014, denying 21 Motion to Screen Complaint and denying 23 Motion to Stay. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robben v. Carson City, Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carson City, Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Alternative Sentencing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Hale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Lucia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doctor Joseph E McEllistrem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rory Planeta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Rombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Summers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge John Tatro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Robben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?