Casillas-Gutierrez v. LeGrand et al
Petitioner: Miguel Casillas-Guitierrez
Respondent: LeGrand and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2013cv00448
Filed: August 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that petitioner's motion to reopen (ECF No. 38 ) is granted; pursuant to petitioner's notice of voluntary dismissal (ECF No. 40 ), this action is dismissed. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/13/2018.; Case reopened. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting Respondents' 22 motion to dismiss insofar as Grounds 2 and 3 of the amended petition are unexhausted; granting Petitioner's 24 motion for a Rhines stay and abeyance (see order for details); staying this action pending exhaustion of the unexhausted claims; directing Clerk to administratively close this action. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Extend Time re 22 Motion to Dismiss. Respondents' reply due by 9/10/2014. No further extensions of time will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 18 Motion to Seal. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/8/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
October 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Counsel for petitioner shall meet with petitioner as soon as reasonably possible in accordance with attached order. Clerk shall serve respondents with copy of this order by certified mail to AG's Office (sent 10/23/13 via certifi ed mail #7013 1090 0000 7467 0614). Respondents' counsel shall enter notice of appearance within 20 days. Amended petition due within 90 days. Parties shall send courtesy copies of all exhibits to Reno division staff attorney. (Please see attached for additional deadlines and details.) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/22/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting Petitioner's 1 motion to proceed IFP. The Clerk shall file the petition. Petitioner's 1 -2 motion for appointment of counsel is granted and the FPD is appointed. The Clerk shall electronically serve this order and the petition on the NV FPD's office (service completed 9/27/2013). FPD shall have 30 days to file a notice of appearance or indicate its inability to represent petitioner in these proceedings. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to the CJA Coordinator. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 05/13/2013. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 09/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Casillas-Gutierrez v. LeGrand et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Miguel Casillas-Guitierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?