June 20, 2019 |
Filing
293
ORDER DISMISSING CASE with Prejudice pursuant to ECF No. 292 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
June 11, 2018 |
Filing
281
ORDER granting ECF No. 280 Unopposed Motion to Exceed Page Limit for Defendants' Replies in Support of Motions for Summary Judgment (ECF Nos. 253 , 254 , 255 , 256 , 257 , 258 ) and Extending the Deadline for Filing the Replies to 6/14/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
May 31, 2018 |
Filing
279
ORDER granting ECF No. 278 Stipulation : Replies in Support of ECF Nos. 253 , 254 , 255 , 256 , 257 and 258 Motions for Summary Judgment due by 6/11/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/31/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
May 3, 2018 |
Filing
277
ORDER granting ECF No. 276 Stipulation Extending the Time to File Replies in Support of ECF Nos. 253 , 254 , 255 , 256 , 257 and 258 Motions for Summary Judgment Replies due by 6/4/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
April 24, 2018 |
Filing
274
ORDER granting ECF No. 272 Stipulation Extending time to file Replies to ECF Nos. 253 , 254 , 255 , 256 , 257 , 258 , 272 and 273 Motions for Summary Judgment. Replies due by 5/4/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
March 29, 2018 |
Filing
264
ORDER granting ECF No. 263 Stipulation for Extension of Time to file opposition to Defendants' motions for summary judgment (ECF Nos. 253 , 254 , 255 , 256 , 257 , and 258 ). Plaintiffs' opposition due by 4/6/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
March 15, 2018 |
Filing
261
ORDER granting ECF No. 260 Stipulation for Extension to file opposition to Defendants' motions for summary judgment (ECF Nos. 253 , 254 , 255 , 256 , 257 , and 258 ). Plaintiffs' opposition due by 3/29/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) Modified on 3/15/2018 to correct ECF No. (LH).
|
February 27, 2018 |
Filing
252
ORDER granting ECF No. 251 Stipulation Extending the Time to Refile Disposition Motions. Dispositive motions due by 3/5/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
February 6, 2018 |
Filing
250
ORDER granting ECF No. 249 Stipulation for Extension of Time to refile dispositive motions; Defendants' shall file complete motions for summary judgment that include briefing on the reinstated claims, if any, by 2/26/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
January 10, 2018 |
Filing
248
ORDER that ECF No. 245 plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED; the court reinstates the plaintiff's fourth, sixth and seventh claims; ECF Nos. 218 , 220 , 222 , 223 , 224 , and 225 defendants' Motions for Sum mary Judgment are DENIED without prejudice; defendants must file complete motions for summary judgment that include briefing on the reinstated claims by 2/9/2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
February 15, 2017 |
Filing
204
ORDER denying ECF No 194 Plaintiffs' Motion to Reconsider Court's 01/12/2016 Order. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 02/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
July 20, 2016 |
Filing
193
ORDER granting ECF No. 192 Motion to Withdraw. The consents to join of Danielle (Alcorn) Nesbit, Tonya Pletzer, Joseph Pontillo, and Gary Riddle are withdrawn. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/19/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
April 11, 2016 |
Filing
180
ORDER granting 179 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings for 180 Days Pending Appeal, Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 22, 2016 |
Filing
175
JUDGMENT entered in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs on Plaintiffs' first cause of action. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 3/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
January 12, 2016 |
Filing
172
ORDERED that GSR's # 135 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED in accordance with this order. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiffs on Plaintiff's Fourth, S ixth, Seventh, and Eighth causes of action. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' # 141 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' # 139 Objection to Working Drafts of Unsigned Collective Bargaining Agreements not Produced in Discovery is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 1/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 31, 2015 |
Filing
171
HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER re 170 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/31/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
October 23, 2015 |
Filing
158
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Larry R. Hicks, on 10/23/2015, re 157 Ex Parte Motion, directing Defendants to serve Plaintiffs with a copy of 157 motion; directing Defendants to file their response to Plaintifffs' motion f or class certifiation and their motion for class decertifiation by 11/4/2015; directing Plaintiffs to file their response to Defendants' motion for class decertification and their reply to their motion for class certification by 11/30/2015; directing Defendants to file their reply to their motion for class decertification by 12/17/2015. No further extensions will be granted. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
August 13, 2015 |
Filing
134
ORDER granting 124 Motion to Withdraw Consent and for Dismissal as to Dana Lottig. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
December 12, 2014 |
Filing
80
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 72 motion. The motion for contempt portion is denied.Request for extension of deadlines is granted consistent with the terms of this order. Joint amended discovery plan and scheduling order due 12/22/2014. Counter motion for contempt is denied.Previously scheduled discovery conference on 12/23/2014 will proceed. Statement of unresolved discovery disputes due no later than noon, 12/22/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing
44
ORDER re 39 Motion for Attorney Fees awarding $10,251.94 in total costs and fees as delineated in attached order. Defendant shall reimburse Plaintiffs their reasonable expenses within 30 days. Please see attached for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
May 6, 2014 |
Filing
40
ORDER granting 18 Motion for Circulation of Notice (see attached for specific details and deadlines) and denying as moot 23 Motion for Oral Argument and 32 Motion for Status Conference. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
April 23, 2014 |
Filing
37
ORDER detailing findings re motion to compel 26 as heard on April 17, 2014 (Ref minutes 36 ). Please see attached for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/22/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|