Happ v. Reno Disposal Co. et el
Plaintiff: |
Karl P. Happ |
Defendant: |
Reno Disposal Co. and Waste Management of Nevada, Inc. |
Case Number: |
3:2013cv00467 |
Filed: |
August 30, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Cobb |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Nature of Suit: |
Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 10, 2015 |
Filing
77
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 52 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
June 10, 2015 |
Filing
75
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 6/10/2015 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden; Pla Counsel: Karl P. Happ, Pro Se (Telephonically); Def Counsel: Elia M. DeLuca (Telephonical ly); FTR #: 10:01:38 a.m. - 10:18:56 a.m.; Time of Hearing: 10:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 2. The court discusses with Plaintiff and Defendants' counsel the rationale for a discovery stay. The court does not find there are suff icient grounds to stay discovery in its entirety. Nevertheless, the court extends the discovery deadlines to allow the parties the opportunity to delay undertaking any expensive discovery, if they so choose. The revised deadlines are as follows: < u>Discovery Cut-Off: Monday, 11/30/2015; Dispositive Motions:Wednesday, 12/30/2015; Joint Pretrial Order:Friday, 1/29/2016. See attached order for additional deadlines. The parties 69 "Unopposed Emerg ency Motion to stay Discovery and Motion Deadlines Pending the Court's Ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to LR 7-5, FRCP Rules 16 and 26" is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
August 26, 2014 |
Filing
48
ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss. The complaint is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff may file an amended complaint within 15 days. (Amended Complaint deadline: 9/10/2014.) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?