Walker v. Haley et al
Plaintiff: John G. Walker
Defendant: Gail Singletary, Dr. Nielson, Greg Herrera and Michael Haley
Case Number: 3:2013cv00485
Filed: September 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING AS MOOT # 38 Motion to Compel. The components of Plaintiff's motions (# 38 and # 43 ) seeking an extension of time to effect service on defendants are GRANTED. Plaintiff shall have until December 1, 2014, to complete service on all unserved defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 10/10/2014, granting Plaintiff's 43 Motion; directing Clerk to issue a summons for Defendant David Evans and send it to the USM along with a copy of the 13 Amen ded Complaint and a copy of this order (placed in USM mailbox 10/10/2014). The Clerk shall send to plaintiff one USM-285 form (mailed via USPS 10/10/2014). Plaintiff shall have until 10/24/2014 to complete the USM-285 form and return it to the USM. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 9/23/2014, granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion for Court Order of Service of Identified Defendants. Plaintiff's motion is granted as to Def endant Ross Taylor. Clerk shall issue summons and deliver same to US Marshal for service. Clerk shall send Plaintiff USM-285 form and copy of amended complaint 13 (mailed 9/23/14). Plaintiff shall have to 10/10/2014 to complete form and r eturn with other documents to US Marshal. Plaintiff's motion is denied as to Defendant Evans. However, Defendants shall address issue of whether "Deputy Evans" can now be identified. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 8/6/2014, denying Plaintiff's 30 Motion for 120 Day Continuance; denying Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Order to release and deliver legal work. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 4/30/2014, granting 11 Motion for Case Status and History. The Clerk shall send a copy of the docket sheet to Plaintiff (transmitted 4/30/2014). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying 4 Motion to adjust 3 order. Payment of initial partial filing fee due 12/16/2013. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/30/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Haley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gail Singletary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Nielson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Haley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John G. Walker
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?