Robert A. Slovak vs Golf Course Villas Homeowners Association, et al
Plaintiff: Robert A. Slovak
Defendant: Golf Course Villas Homeowners Association, Golf Course Villas Limited Partnership and Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00569
Filed: October 10, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Ti
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER granting ECF Nos. 340 and 344 Motions to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/19/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SC)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 350 ORDER- The emergency motion to continue hearing, (ECF No. 341 ), is GRANTED. The Court's minute order, (ECF No. 349 ), is hereby VACATED. Slovak shall have until August 23, 2021 to file an opposition to Wells Fargo' s motion to exclude witnesses. (ECF No. 338 .) Wells Fargo shall file a reply no later than August 30, 2021. No extensions of time to file either document will be granted for any reason. Both parties are ordered to email any document(s) and accompanying attachments and/or exhibits that are electronically filed via CM/ECF in this case directly to their opposing counsel between now and the rescheduled hearing date to ensure that all documents are received by the opposing party. The in-pe rson evidentiary is hearing is set for October 14 & 15, 2021. If there are any conflicts with this date, the parties shall contact the Courtroom Deputy, Lisa Mann, at 775-686-5653 on or before August 23, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SMR)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 335 ORDER denying ECF No. 331 Plaintiff's motion for clarification and leave to conduct pre-hearing discovery, and denying as moot ECF No. 332 Plaintiff's motion for order shortening time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/16/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 327 ORDER - Defendant's Motion for Leave to Appear Remote Means (ECF No. 318 ) is denied. Plaintiff filed a notice of deposition of expert witness and a notice of deposition of records custodian (ECF No. 326 ). Pursuant to LR 26- 7, discovery-related papers are not to be filed. Such notices should not be filed. Therefore, ECF No. 326 is hereby stricken. Counsel for Plaintiff are again reminded that they are required to follow the Local Rules of Practice in this district - including those attorneys admitted to practice in this case pro hac vice. Any additional failures to follow the Local Rules will result in the court issuing an order to show cause why sanctions should not be imposed pursuant to LR IA 11-8(c). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 5/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 324 ORDER granting ECF No. 323 Stipulation : Reply to ECF No. 322 Response re ECF No. 318 Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically due by 5/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 5/11/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 321 ORDER granting ECF No. 320 Stipulation. Mr. Slovak's response to the Motion (ECF No. 318 ) will be due no later than May 4, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/27/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting 316 Stipulation; The In-Person Evidentiary Hearing currently set for set for 5/17/2021 and 5/18/2021 are VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 8/19/2021 and 8/20/2021 both commencing at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 4/7/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER: A two-day in-person evidentiary hearing is set for 5/17/2021 and 5/18/2021 both at 09:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER to Deposit Funds in Blocked Account at One Nevada Credit Union re ECF No. 307 Proposed Order : Within seven (7) business days of entry of this Order (3/2/2021) Mr. Slovak must perform as specified herein. This Order only changes the location of deposit and does not otherwise alter Mr. Slovak's obligations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 305 ORDER granting ECF No. 303 Motion to Extend Time. Mr. Slovak has an additional seven (7) days within which to review and, if necessary, modify Wells Fargo's draft proposal in order to comply with his side of the Court's January 8, 2021 meet and confer directive (ECF No. 301 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/12/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDERED that Plaintiff's Objection (ECF No. 283 ) is denied. It is further ordered that Defendant Wells Fargo's motion to strike (ECF No. 289 ) is granted. Plaintiff's improper reply (ECF No. 288 ) is stricken. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER that Mr. Slovak deposit $280,000 with the Clerk of Court, to be deposited in an interest-bearing account, within sixty (60) days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 3/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 280 ORDER - Wells Fargo's Motion for Attorneys' fees and costs (ECF No. 263 ) is DENIED.Slovak's Motion to Strike (ECF No. 268 ) is DENIED as moot.Slovak's Motion for Leave to file a sur-reply (ECF No. 273 ) is DENIED as moot.Slovak's objections (ECF No. 278 ) are STRICKEN from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 2/26/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting ECF No. 266 Motion to Extend Time to Respond to ECF No. 263 Motion; Response to Court's Query in Order Denying Request (ECF No. 265 ). Responses due by 1/10/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 12/17/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 265 ORDER DENYING without prejudice ECF No. 264 Motion/Stipulation to Extend Time. The parties are granted leave to file a second stipulation on or before Monday, December 16, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 12/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 12/11/2019 to denote as stipulation (DRM).
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 251 ORDER that the currently scheduled hearing set for February 7-8, 2019 is hereby vacated; Mr. Slovak shall deposit $280,000 with the Clerk of Court on or before Monday, March 25, 2019 pursuant to LR 67-1. The funds shall be held in an interest-bearing account established by the Clerk pursuant to LR 67-2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 1/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 247 ORDER granting ECF No. Motion : Plaintiff's request for a 4-day extension of time to file his motion on Friday, December 28, 2018, is granted. No further extensions shall be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 12/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER granting ECF No. 224 Application for Extension of Time to File Reply to ECF No. 218 Motion for Sanctions. Reply due by 9/11/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 9/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 211 ORDER granting ECF No. 209 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion for Sanctions (Second Request). Motion for Sanctions due by 8/16/2018. This is the final extension. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 208 ORDER granting ECF No. 207 Application for Extension of Time to File Motions for Sanctions (First Request). Motion for Sanctions due by 7/13/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER granting ECF No. 203 Motion for an order for Production of Transcripts From Sealed Recordings of Hearings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting ECF No. 191 Motion to Seal Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.'s Supplemental Case Management Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/13/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER granting ECF No. 178 Stipulation to Reschedule Status Check for 5/10/2018 at 2:00 PM in Reno Courtroom 1 before Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER granting ECF No. 172 Motion to Substitute Attorney Tory M. Pankopf in for Robert A. Slovak Pro Se. (Mailed to P on 1/22/2018) Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 1/22/2018., (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH) Modified on 1/22/2018 to denote mailing (LH).
December 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER granting ECF No. 169 Stipulation : Reply to Response re Sealed Motion to Enforce Settlement Agreement due by 1/12/2018. There shall be no further extensions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER granting ECF No. 167 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply to ECF No. 165 Response to ECF No. 156 Motion to Enforce Settlement. Reply due by 12/15/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/4/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER adopting and accepting 124 Report and Recommendation; granting 107 Motion to Enforce Settlement; ratifying the Settlement Agreement as the binding agreement between Plaintiff and Defendant; ordering Plaintiff to perform under the terms of the settlement agreement; dismissing with prejudice this action and directing Clerk to close the case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/31/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER GRANTING Wells Fargo Bank's # 106 Motion to Seal : The # 107 Motion to enforce settlement is filed and shall remain under seal. Plaintiff's # 114 Motion to file response to motion to enforce settlement and declaration under seal is GRANTED : The # 115 Response and # 116 Declaration are filed and shall remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING # 100 Motion to be excused from the Monday, September 22, 2014 status conference by Golf Course Villas Homeowners' Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 9/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 8/29/2014, granting Plaintiff's 97 motion to unseal the recording from the settlement conference. The Clerk shall produce, at plaintiff's expense, an audio CD of the 83 settlement conference minutes. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 7/28/2014, striking 87 motion to unseal the recording from the settlement conference. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robert A. Slovak vs Golf Course Villas Homeowners Association, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golf Course Villas Homeowners Association
Represented By: John C. Boyden
Represented By: Brett A. Dieffenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golf Course Villas Limited Partnership
Represented By: John C. Boyden
Represented By: Brett A. Dieffenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Richard Gordon
Represented By: Catherine M. O'Mara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert A. Slovak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?