July 1, 2019 |
Filing
450
ORDER granting ECF No. 449 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Atlantic Richfield Company and Park Livestock Co. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/1/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
May 8, 2018 |
Filing
357
ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF Nos. 339 ARCO's Motions in Limine and 340 Diamond X's Consolidated Motions in Limine. (See Order for further details). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
May 3, 2018 |
Filing
351
ORDER overruling Diamond X's ECF No. 338 Objection. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
December 20, 2017 |
Filing
316
ORDER granting ECF No. 315 Motion to Extend Time to respond to ECF Motion 309 Motion to Exclude. Diamond X Ranch, LLC and Park Livestock Co's Response due by 1/9/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
October 25, 2017 |
Filing
306
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motions Hearing held on 10/25/2017 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb.. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden; Pla Counsel: Aaron Allan (telephonically), Fred Heather, Brad Johnston, and Noah Perch-Ahern (present); Def Counsel: Adam Cohen and Jonathan Rauchway (telephonically), Robert Dotson and Mead Dickson (present); Recorder: FTR; Recording start and end times: 8:33:55 a.m. - 9:30:02 a.m.; Courtroom: 2. The deadline to exchange additional or supplemental expert reports simultaneously is Wednesday, 11/15/2017. Atlantic Richfield's 303 motion to extend time to file the proposed JPTO is GRANTED in part and DENIED in pa rt. The proposed JPTO is due on or before Wednesday, 1/31/2018. The court requires the parties to exchange information as follows: (1) Diamond X shall provide a statement of contested and uncontested issues of fact and law and a propo sed witness list on or before Friday, 11/10/2017; (2) Atlantic Richfield shall respond to Diamond X statement of contested and uncontested issues of fact and law and provide a draft witness list on or before Wednesday, 11/22/2017. Th e deadline to submit the settlement conference statements to Judge McQuaid is extended to 4:00 p.m., Monday, 11/27/2017. In view of the deadlines imposed, Diamond X's 304 motion is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. < p>IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall submit a separate notice with the court on or before Friday, 12/29/2017, identifying three (3) prospective trial dates agreed on between the parties and an estimated total number of days to complete a jury trial in this case. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
September 29, 2017 |
Filing
300
ORDER - ARCO's Motion for Summary Judgment on Diamond X's Tort Claims as Barred by the Statute of Limitations (ECF No. 228 ) is granted in part and denied in part. It is further ordered that ARCO's Motion for Summary Judgment on Diamond X's Seventh and Eighth Claims under CERCLA (ECF No. 229 ) is granted in part and denied in part. It is further ordered that ARCO's Motion for Summary Judgment to Limit or Dismiss Diamond X's Tort Claims (ECF No. 230 ) is granted in part and denied in part. It is further ordered that Diamond X's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Concerning ARCO's Liability as to CERCLA and Certain Common Law Claims (ECF No. 231 ) is denied. It is further or dered that ARCO's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on ARCO's CERCLA Claims against Diamond X and Park Livestock (ECF No. 248 ) is granted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
August 26, 2016 |
Filing
224
ORDER denying Diamond X's ECF No. 144 Motion to Dismiss; denying Park Livestock's ECF No. 182 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
July 21, 2016 |
Filing
220
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 7/21/2016 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden; Pla Counsel: Noah Perch-Ahern, Fred D. Heather and Brad Johnston (Present); Def Counsel: Jona than W. Rauchway, Robert Dotson (Present) and Adam S. Cohen and Mave Anne Gasaway (Telephonically); FTR #: FTR; Time of Hearing: 1:39:08 p.m. - 2:44:52 p.m. and (SEALED 2:59:02 p.m . - 4:38:51 p.m.) ; Courtroom: 2. The court hears oral arguments. IT IS ORDERED that Diamond X's Motion to Compel Concerning ARCO's Disclosure of Marc Lombardi (ECF No. 192 ) is DENIED. IT IS ORDERED that ARCO's Motion to Compel Document Withheld on the Basis of Privilege (ECF No. 188 ) is DENIED. Diamond X need not produce the "Bailey Document." IT IS ORDERED the Bailey Document (ECF No. 189-1) shall remain under seal. IT IS ORDERE D that pursuant to the agreement of counsel, the one remaining expert deposition may be taken after the close of discovery. The parties represent that neither seeks leave to re-open discovery at this time. The parties are reminded of their right to submit objections. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
|
August 13, 2015 |
Filing
118
ORDER denying 76 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order; granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion to Dismiss; and granting 97 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
June 30, 2015 |
Filing
114
ORDER re 111 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. The court concurs with Plaintiff that a new deadline for amending pleadings or adding parties should be adopted and any motions to effect such amendments, shall be made by November 6, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
September 30, 2014 |
Filing
67
ORDER granting Defendant's 27 Motion to Dismiss, with regard to Plaintiff's claims for civil penalties and declaratory and injunctive relief in Claims 5, 6, 7, and 8. The Court will set oral argument and issue a separate Order with regard to Plaintiff's monetary damages claim in Claim 8. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
September 26, 2014 |
Filing
65
PROTECTIVE ORDER on 64 Stipulation re Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/26/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
July 30, 2014 |
Filing
55
ORDER granting the parties' 54 joint motion. The deadlines set forth in Section G of the DPSO are hereby vacated, except for the 8/29/2014 deadline for submission of an Interim Status Report. Within 30 days Diamond X shall obt ain new lead counsel and an appearance shall be entered by new lead counsel. The deadline to respond to all pending discovery is extended to 14 days after new lead counsel for Diamond X has entered an appearance. On the date that an appearance is e ntered by new lead counsel for Diamond X, the parties shall also file a request for the setting of a scheduling conference. The parties shall file a proposed revised set of deadlines with the court at least 5 days prior to the scheduling conference. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
February 4, 2014 |
Filing
45
ORDER re 44 Proposed Order Submission granting in part and denying in part 30 MOTION to Disqualify Snell & Wilmer, LLP and Davis Graham & Stubbs LLP as Defendants' Counsel and Memorandum of Points and Authorities. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 2/4/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|