Applications in Internet Time, LLC v. Salesforce.com, Inc.
Plaintiff: Applications in Internet Time, LLC
Defendant: Salesforce.com, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00628
Filed: November 8, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO EXTEND RESPONSIVE DEADLINES TO SALESFORCE'S MOTION REGARDING CORRECTED EXPERT REPORT (ECF 351 ) - granting ECF No. 365 Stipulation (First Request). Response due by 1/17/2023 and Reply due by 2/7/2023 as to ECF No. 351 Motion. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/10/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
December 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO SEAL - Salesforce's motions redact and to seal, (ECF Nos. 343 , 344 , 349 , 362 ), are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 12/29/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
October 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER granting ECF No. 284 Stipulation. Response due by 10/28/2022 and Replies due by 11/18/2022 as to ECF No. 281 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/11/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJS)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER - Elizabeth Long withdrawn as attorney of record for Plaintiff Applications in Internet Time, LLC. Counsel of record for Applications in Internet Time, LLC otherwise remains the same (re: ECF No. 266 Notice). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 8/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
July 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Salesforces Motion to Leave to File Documents under Seal (ECF No. 188 ) is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applications in Internet Time, LLCs Motion to Strike Portions of Salesforces Amended Invalidity C ontentions (ECF No. 185 ) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the following portions of Salesforces 2022 Amended Contentions are STRICKEN: the 21 new prior art references, including new theories of anticipation or obviousness base d on those newly added prior art references; and the new theories of invalidity based on 35 U.S.C. § 112.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Salesforce shall have 14 days from the entry of this Order to show whether, for each stricken amendment , it has good cause related to the claim construction order and should be granted leave to re-submit the amendment.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court defers ruling on Salesforces Oral Motion to Strike made during the hearing on AITs Motion to St rike.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Applications in Internet Time shall have 14 days from entry of this Order to show whether, for each amendment specifically challenged by Salesforce in its opposition (ECF No. 187 ) to AITs Motion to Strike, it has good cause related to the claim construction order to make each such amendment. (Show Cause Response due by 8/9/2022.) Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/26/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJD)
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO SEAL (ECF Nos. 217 , 230 , 243 ) - IT IS SO ORDERED that Motions to Seal, (ECF Nos. 217 , 230 , 243 ), are GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 7/13/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJD)
June 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO SEAL ECF Nos. 191 , 197 , 200 , 207 re: ECF Nos. 190 , 195 , 199 , 206 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 6/10/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CJD)
June 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER - Plaintiff Applications in Internet Time, LLC's Request for a Status Conference (ECF No. 205 ) is GRANTED. Oral argument on Plaintiff Applications in Internet Time, LLC's Opening Brief in Support of its Motion to Strike Por tions of Salesforce.com's Amended Invalidity Contentions (ECF No. 185 ), is set for 1:30 P.M., Monday, June 6, 2022, in Reno Courtroom 3, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/1/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HKL)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER granting ECF No. 211 Stipulation re Representative Production of Source Code. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 5/31/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER re terms constructions. (See pdf order for specifics.) Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting ECF No. 155 Stipulation. Plaintiff to submit the reply claim construction brief by May 4, 2021. Defendant to submit the sur-reply claim construction brief by May 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/23/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER - The Motion to Lift Stay (ECF No. 130 ) is granted. The Motion for Status Conference (ECF No. 141 ) is granted. The parties shall appear for a Motion Hearing via Zoom Videoconference on March 22, 2021 at 11:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 6 before Judge Robert C. Jones. The parties are directed to contact the courtroom deputy Lesa Ettinger (Lesa_Ettinger@nvd.uscourts.gov or 775-686-5833) by Noon, Friday, March 19, 2021, to provide her the e-mail address of each counsel, party and/or representative attending the hearing. Video Conference Instructions shall be adhered to as specified herein. The Public may access and listen to the Hearing as follows: Public telephonic participants shall call AT&T no later than five (5) minutes prior to the hearing at 1 (888) 675-2535. Access Code is 2900398 Security Code 032221. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcast ing of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER approving ECF No. 126 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Elizabeth Long on behalf of Applications in Internet Time, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael A. Burke. Signed by Judg e Robert C. Jones on 10/21/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER granting ECF No. 123 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Steve W. Berman and Philip Graves withdrawn from case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 9/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER - The parties shall file a Joint Status Report every sixty days beginning on March 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/5/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER continuing the stay; directing the parties to file status reports regarding the PTAB's IPR proceedings by 3/29/2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER approving ECF No. 95 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice as to Philip Graves on behalf of Applications in Internet Time, LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michael A. Burke. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/28/2018. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 9/17/2018 at 10:00 A.M. in Reno Courtroom 3 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting ECF No. 77 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER denying 66 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER lifting the stay and directing the parties to proceed in this case pursuant to Local Rules re 57 Status Report. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/27/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Applications in Internet Time, LLC v. Salesforce.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Applications in Internet Time, LLC
Represented By: Christopher D. Banys
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Nicholas S. Boebel
Represented By: Barry L. Breslow
Represented By: Richard C. Lin
Represented By: Keegan G. Low
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salesforce.com, Inc.
Represented By: Leigh T Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?