Fernandez v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Fernandez
Defendant: Robert Bannister, RN G. Carpenter, J. Garner, Bert Jackson, Carla Marikami, Morningoff, Nevada Department of Corrections, M. Serrano and State of Nevada
Case Number: 3:2013cv00670
Filed: December 5, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting ECF No. 51 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER on ECF No. 49 Stipulation : Settlement documents due by 12/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting ECF No. 47 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice (Final Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 43 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to File Stipulation and Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Settlement documents are due by 9/10/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/9/2018. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER that the Motion for Reconsideration (ECF No. 34 ) is DENIED; the case is DISMISSED without prejudice; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/10/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER denying ECF No. 1 IFP Application; giving Plaintiff 30 days to pay filing fees; denying ECF No. 32 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 8/7/2017, denying Plaintiff's ECF No. 28 Motion for Court to Issue and Serve the Summons and Amended Complaint. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDERED that the motion for reconsideration (ECF No. 22 ) is denied as moot. Further ordered the Motion to Extend Time (ECF No. 24 ) is granted : Amended Complaint due by 10/28/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis ECF No. 1 is reinstated and deferred. If Plaintiff chooses to file an amended complaint curing deficiencies, the amended complaint is due by October 16, 2016. Clerk to send Plaintiff the appro ved form for filing a § 1983 complaint, instructions, original Complaint ECF No. 4 , original Screening Order ECF No. 3 and Ninth Circuit Order ECF. No. 16 . If an amended complaint is not filed, Plaintiff must file a written notice informing the Court of his intent to proceed with this case. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint and/or notify the Court of his intent by October 16, 2016, this case will be dismissed with prejudice. See Order for further details. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 09/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez v. Jackson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bannister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RN G. Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Garner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bert Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carla Marikami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morningoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?