November 1, 2021 |
Filing
81
ORDERED the petition for a writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 (ECF No. 57 ) is denied. A certificate of appealability is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/1/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
July 21, 2020 |
Filing
76
ORDER that Petitioner's unopposed motion for an extension of time (fourth request) (ECF No. 75 ) is granted. Petitioner will have up to and including August 3, 2020, to file a reply to the answer (ECF No. 61 ). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
|
June 19, 2020 |
Filing
74
ORDER that Petitioner's unopposed motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 73 ) is granted. Petitioner will have up to and including July 20, 2020, to file a reply to the answer (ECF No. 61 ).Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
|
April 20, 2020 |
Filing
71
ORDER that Petitioner's unopposed motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 70 ) is granted. Petitioner will have up to and including June 19, 2020, to file a reply to the answer (ECF No. 61 ). Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
|
March 27, 2020 |
Filing
68
ORDER that Petitioner's unopposed motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 67 ) is granted. Petitioner will have up to and including April 20, 2020, to file a reply to the answer (ECF No. 61 ).Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
|
November 25, 2019 |
Filing
60
ORDER granting 56 59 Motions to Extend Time. Response Re: 57 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus due 2/10/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LG)
|
July 25, 2019 |
Filing
55
ORDER - The joint motion for scheduling order (ECF No. 54 ) is granted. Amended Petition due by 9/24/2019; answer/motion to dismiss due 60 days thereafter. (See pdf order for additional contingent deadlines.) Paper copies of any electronically filed exhibits need not be provided to chambers or to the staff attorney, unless later directed by the Court. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/25/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
June 4, 2019 |
Filing
51
ORDER. Following upon the order of the Court of Appeals reversing and remanding for reconsideration of all rulings herein, both procedural rulings and on the merits, and pending the issuance of the mandate, it is therefore ordered that counsel will meet and confer with one another regarding how to proceed. It is further ordered that, within 7 days of the issuance of the mandate, counsel will either jointly or separately file a motion or motions for a scheduling order. See order for specifics. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/4/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PAV)
|
March 7, 2017 |
Filing
41
JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
September 29, 2015 |
Filing
31
ORDER - Respondents' # 21 motion to dismiss is granted in part with respect to ground 3; therefore petitioner shall have until 10/29/2015 to inform court that he wishes to dismiss ground 3 of # 14 second amended petition, or, inform court with sworn declaration that he wishes to dismiss his # 14 second amended petition and return to state court to exhaust ground 3, or, move to stay this action while he returns to state court to exhaust as to ground 3. (See pdf order for additio nal deadlines and specifics.) It is further ordered that petitioner's # 25 motion for enlargement is granted; and petitioner's # 30 motion for ruling is denied as moot. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/29/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
November 20, 2014 |
Filing
16
ORDER denying as moot 10 motion for clarification; denying 11 motion for appointment of counsel; denying as moot 12 motion for evidentiary hearing; granting 13 motion for leave to file oversized petition; dismis sing ground 15 of 14 second amended petition; directing Clerk to add the NV AG as counsel for respondents and to e-serve respondents a copy of this order and 14 petition (NEFs sent 11/21/2014); directing Clerk to send pet itioner a copy of 14 petition (mailed 11/21/2014). Respondents to respond to petition with 45 days; petitioner to reply within 45 days thereafter. Any exhibits shall be filed with separate index. Hard copies of any exhibits shall be forwarded, fo r this case, to staff attorneys in Las Vegas. Petitioner shall serve respondents copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
August 14, 2014 |
Filing
6
ORDER Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 4 is granted. Clerk shall file motion to file oversized petition, motion for evidentiary hearing, and motion for appointment of counsel. Motions denied. Clerk shall send pe titioner a petition for writ of habeas corpus form with instructions (sent via US Mail 8/14/14). Petitioner shall have 30 days to file second amended petition. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|