Tiffany v. LeGrand et al
Petitioner: David Tiffany
Respondent: Catherine Cortez-Masto and Robert LeGrand
Case Number: 3:2013cv00682
Filed: December 12, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER - Petitioner's Motion to Lift Stay and Abey and Proceed with Exhausted Grounds (ECF No. 88 ) and Motion for Appointment of Counsel (ECF No. 89 ) are denied. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER that the petition for writ of habeas corpus in this case ECF No. 2 is denied on the merits; this action is therefore dismissed with prejudice; Petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability, except with respect to the following issue: whether the Nevada Supreme Court was objectively unreasonable in concluding that Petitioner's due process rights were not violated by the trial court's denial of fees for an investigator; Petitioner is granted a certificate of appealability in this respect and denied a certificate of appealability in all other respects; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close this action. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting ECF No. 68 Motion to Extend Time to respond to ECF No. 67 Answer to Habeas Petition. Reply due by 3/22/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER granting ECF No. 65 Motion for Enlargement of Time; Respondents' answer to petition due 1/4/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that respondents must file an answer to remaining grounds of the original petition by 12/29/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDERED that the amended petition (ECF No. 49 ), filed without leave of court is hereby stricken. Clerk shall send petitioner a copy of his amended petition (ECF No. 49 ). (Mailed to P 11/15/2017.) Respondents' motion for clarification (EC F No. 61 ) is denied as moot. Respondents' motion for an extension of time to file the answer up to and including November 13, 2017 (ECF No. 59 ), is granted nunc pro tunc to November 9, 2017. Respondents' motion for enlargemen t of time (ECF No. 60 ) is denied as moot. However, the deadline for respondents to answer the petition is hereby stayed and will be reset after the Court has resolved any motion to amend or after the time for filing such a motion has expired. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER that petitioners motion for a stay and abeyance ECF No. 42 is denied; petitioners fourth motion for the appointment of counsel ECF No. 45 is denied; motion for reconsideration ECF No. 48 of the Courts order of 02/17/2015 i s denied; the unexhausted grounds specified in the Courts order of 02/17/2015, at page 9, are dismissed without prejudice; respondents must file and serve an answer to the remaining grounds of the petition by 09/21/2017; petitioner must file and serve a reply to the answer, within 30 days after being served with the answer. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 08/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - # 32 Motion for reconsideration is denied. # 37 Motion for hearing is denied. # 38 Motion for counsel is denied. P shall inform court by 4/23/2016 by sworn delclaration re abandonment of unexhausted claims, dismissal of petition to return to state court to exhaust, or file motion for stay and abeyance. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER denying 5 and 8 Motions to Appoint Counsel; and granting 12 Motion to Dismiss in accordance with the terms of the attached order. Petitioner shall have 30 days to advise Court re unexhausted claims. Please see attached for further details/deadlines. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tiffany v. LeGrand et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: David Tiffany
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?