Cass, Inc. v. Production Pattern and Foundry Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Cass, Inc.
Defendant: Production Pattern and Foundry Co., Inc.
Case Number: 3:2013cv00701
Filed: December 23, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER re Notice of Filing of Bankruptcy (ECF No. 164 ) : All action in this case is STAYED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Production Pattern and Foundry Co., Inc. shall file a notice with the court upon completion of the bankruptcy action. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER denying ECF No. 138 Defendant Production Pattern and Foundry's Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order; granting ECF No. 137 Plaintiff Cass's Motion for Partial Entry of Judgment; Clerk directed to enter ju dgment on CASS's second breach-of-contract claim in CASS's favor and against Production Pattern and Foundry in the amount of $917,203.13. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 07/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 107 Defendant Production Pattern and Foundry's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 108 Plaintiff CASS's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part ECF No. 109 Plaintiff CASS's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying ECF No. 117 Defendant Production Pattern and Foundry's Motion to Strike. It is Further Ordered that the parties shall submit a Proposed Joint Pretrial Order by 5/7/2017. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 03/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER - Defendant's # 72 Motion is GRANTED as to the request to exceed the five page limit in its response and is DENIED as to the request the court vacate the hearing. Defendant's brief addressing the substance of Plaintiff's # 69 emergency motion shall be filed by 2:00 p.m., today, September 21, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/21/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDERED that PPF's # 52 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. CASS' account stated claim is dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that PPF's Request that the Court take judicial notice of the corporate records maintained by the California Secretary of State is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 6/23/2015 before Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. Crtrm Administrator: Katie Lynn Ogden; Pla Counsel: Anna Le May and Ruben Castellon (Telephonically); Def Counsel: Kara Marie Hayes (Telephonically); FTR #: 9:05:39 a.m. - 9:40:40 a.m.; Time of Hearing: 9:00 a.m.; Courtroom: 2. Defendant's 56 Motion for Stay of Depositions, to Extend Scheduling Order Deadlines Pending Decision on Motion to Dismi ss, and for Limitation of Discovery Based Upon FRCP 26(b)(2)(c) [Third Request] is DENIED in part and GRANTED in part. The court will not stay the depositions of Ray Switzer and Nicholas Drakos. Furthermore, the court will not qu ash the subpoena issued to CALM. The discovery deadlines are modified as follows: Discovery Cut-Off: 9/30/2015; Dispositive Motions: 10/30/2015; Reubttal Expert Reports: 7/31/2015; and Joint Pretrial Order: 11/30/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/30/2015. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KO)
March 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Dismiss. CASS shall have 30 days to file Second Amended Complaint if it elects to do so. CASS' and PPF's Requests that the Court take judicial notice of documents filed in California court 36 and 39 are granted. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 8/7/2014, denying Defendant's 22 and 23 motions. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cass, Inc. v. Production Pattern and Foundry Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cass, Inc.
Represented By: Ruben Castellon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Production Pattern and Foundry Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?