Smith v. LeGrand et al
Petitioner: Keith G. Smith
Respondent: Robert LeGrand and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2014cv00029
Filed: January 13, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDERED that the Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (ECF No. 15 ) is denied. It is further ordered that Petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER that ECF No. 66 Petitioner's Unopposed Motion For An Extension of Time to File a Reply to ECF No. 61 Answer (third request) is granted; reply due by 8/10/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/25/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER that Petitioner's unopposed motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 64 ) is granted. Petitioner will have until 7/20/2018 to file a reply to the answer (ECF No. 61 ). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting ECF No. 62 Unopposed motion for extension of time to file reply to ECF No. 61 Answer to ECF No. 15 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Reply due by 5/21/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER granting ECF No. 59 Motion to Extend Time to file answer to Petition. Respondents' answer due 2/5/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting ECF No. 57 Motion for Enlargement of Time (Second Request). Answer to petition due 2/1/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting ECF No. 55 Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time. Respondents' answer due 1/18/2018. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting ECF No. 51 Petitioner's Motion for Partial Dismissal of Grounds 7, 8 and part of 6(e); Respondents' answer to remaining grounds due 11/18/2017; Petitioner will have 45 days from the date on which the answer is served to file a reply. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/04/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDERED that respondents' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 15 ) is granted in part. Ground 6(a) is dismissed as untimely. Ground 7, ground 8, and the part of Ground 6(e) described herein are unexhausted. Petitioner will have until 9/6/2017 to file a motion for dismissal without prejudice of the entire petition, for partial dismissal of Ground 7, Ground 8, and the part of Ground 6(e) described herein, or for other appropriate relief. Within 10 days of filing such motion, petitioner must file a signed declaration as specified herein. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for an extension of time (ECF No. 40 ) is granted. Petitioner will have through December 15, 2016, to file and serve a response to the motion to dismiss (ECF No. 29 ). It is further ordered that respondents' motion for waiver of compliance with LR IA 10-3 (ECF No. 39 ) is granted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/7/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying ECF No. 24 Motion for More Definite Statement. Respondents have until 10/17/2016 to file and serve an answer, which must comply with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner will have 45 days from the date on which the answer is served to file a reply. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 09/02/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER directing respondents to answer or respond to 15 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus within 45 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. LeGrand et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Keith G. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?