Steven Floyd Voss v. Isidaro Baca et al
Plaintiff: Steven Floyd Voss
Defendant: Isidro Baca, Greg Cox, William Humphrey, E.K. McDaniel, Shannon Moyle, Monica Navarro, Ronald Schreckengost and Lisa Walsh
Case Number: 3:2014cv00066
Filed: January 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 7/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER denying Plaintiff's 136 / 138 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/26/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER adopting in part and rejecting in part 129 R&R; denying Plaintiff's 39 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting Defendants' 74 Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend; granting Defendants' 117 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
May 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER - Plaintiff's # 119 Motion to strike is DENIED. Ps response to # 117 Motion for summary judgment due by 6/9/2015. Reply due by 6/23/2015. THERE WILL BE NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS relative to briefing on Defendants' # 117 Motion for summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/19/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER denying 111 Motion to Alter or Amend. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDERED that the Objections (## 86 , 104 , 108 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/25/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER denying Plaintiff's motions 80 , 90 / 101 with respect to striking Plaintiff's deposition; denying Plaintiff's motions 80 , 90 / 101 with respect to striking Defendants' reply 89 ; and deferring< /B> resolution of the propriety of Defendants' utilization of letters or correspondence containing comments on settlement discussions and Plaintiff's contentions that certain portions of his deposition transcript were inaccurate or omitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER DENYING # 87 Motion to delay consideration of motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 70 request for a transcript of his deposition; denying Plaintiff's request for "stenographer's verbatim stenotype notes." Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/31/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 15, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER GRANTING # 61 Motion to Enlarge Time. Plaintiff shall have an enlargement of time of up to and including October 24, 2015, to serve Defendant Humphrey. Clerk shall ISSUE summons for William Humphrey and send same to USM with # 44 Address un der seal, together with one copy this order and one copy this order. ( Delivered to USM on 9/15/2014. ) Clerk shall SEND P one USM-285 form; P shall return to USM by Wednesday 9/25/2014. ( Form and instant Order mailed to P 9/15/2014. ) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Clerk shall electronically serve copy of this order and copy of complaint 20 on AG's Office (served via NEF/NEF regeneration). Subject to 19 Screening Order, within 21 days, the AG's Office shall file notice advising Court re acceptance of service (see attached for details). Answer due within 60 days for any represented defendants. Henceforth, plaintiff shall serve upon defendants copy of every pleading submitted. Motion for Summary Judgment 37 is denied without prejudice as premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/28/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying motion to compel service by US mail 25 , denying motion for leave of court to file time sensitive pleadings during the stay 27 , and denying motion for reconsideration 27 -1. Clerk shall send Plaintiff copy o f Court's General Order No. 2012-01 (First Amended). Clerk and AG's Office shall continue to use e-filing program in this case. To ensure that Plaintiff receives copy of this order, Clerk shall send Plaintiff copy of this order and genera l order specified above through US mail and through e-filing service. All further orders shall be sent through e-filing program only. The 90-day stay shall remain in effect and Plaintiff shall not file any other pleadings or papers during remainder of the stay. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER RE INFORMAL SETTLEMENT DISCUSSIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/2/2014. A courtesy copy of this order and the complaint shall be provided to defendants' counsel by the Clerk (NEFs sent 5/2/2014). (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Steven Floyd Voss v. Isidaro Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Cox
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Humphrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K. McDaniel
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Moyle
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monica Navarro
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Schreckengost
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Walsh
Represented By: Andrea Barraclough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Floyd Voss
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?