Thunder Properties, Inc. v. Wood et al
Plaintiff: Thunder Properties, Inc.
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A., Countrywide Home Loans, Inc., National Default Servicing Corporation, Cynthia A. Wood and James L. Wood
Amicus: Real Property Section of State Bar of Nevada
Case Number: 3:2014cv00068
Filed: January 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER denying ECF No. 102 Motion to Reconsider. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 05/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 JUDGMENT in favor of Bank of America, N.A.. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDERED that Thunder Properties' # 37 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Dismiss and granting 29 Motion to Amend Answer. Defendants may plead counterclaims within 7 days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDERED that the # 6 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. All claims are dismissed except the claim for quiet title. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the # 14 Motion to Stay is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/9/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thunder Properties, Inc. v. Wood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Steven G. Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Countrywide Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Darren T Brenner
Represented By: Steven G. Shevorski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Default Servicing Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia A. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James L. Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus: Real Property Section of State Bar of Nevada
Represented By: Michael E. Buckley
Represented By: William P Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thunder Properties, Inc.
Represented By: Roger P. Croteau
Represented By: Timothy Rhoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?