M'wanza v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Tacuma J. M'wanza
Respondent: Renee Baker and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2014cv00096
Filed: February 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 3/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting 21 Motion to Extend Time to Answer Remaining Claims re 4 Petition and denying 23 Motion for Finality of Determination. Answer due within 30 days. Reply due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Respondents' 9 Motion to Dismiss (see order for details); allowing Respondents 45 days to answer Petitioner's remaining claims for relief, Petitioner to reply 30 days thereaf ter; denying Petitioner's 8 Motion for Preliminary Consideration Due to Default; granting nunc pro tunc 7 , 14 , and 15 Motions for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 1 IFP application; directing Clerk to file the petition and motion for appointment of counsel, and to regenerate NEFs of remaining filings herein to NV AG (NEFs sent 8/5/2014); denying the motion for appointment of counsel; allowing respondents 60 days to respond to the petition (see order for details) and petitioner 30 days to reply. Any exhibits shall be filed with separate index. Hard copies of any exhibits shall be forwarded, for this case, to the Reno Clerk's Office. Petitioner shall serve respondents copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M'wanza v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tacuma J. M'wanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?