Robinson v. Howell
Plaintiff: Kirt D. Robinson
Defendant: Shannon Howell
Case Number: 3:2014cv00149
Filed: March 21, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER - Plaintiff shall file on or before February 14, 2015, proof of service of Plaintiff's complaint upon defendant Howell, or good cause is shown why such service was not made prior to the deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/17/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re 8 Response to 4(m) Notice. The court requests counsel for defendant Paulsen to either file notice of acceptance of service or submit last known addresses for defendants Howell and Nagel (see also Case 3:13-cv-422) under seal with the clerk of the court. Please see attached for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 17, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - # 1 IFP application is granted. However even if this action is dismissed the full filing fee must still be paid. NDOC shall pay Clerk from inmate account. Clerk shall send copy this order to Finance and NDOC Inmate Services. (Email to Finan ce; U.S. Mail to NDOC on 4/17/2014.) Clerk shall file the complaint. Clerk shall issue summons to named defendant and deliver same with copy of complaint to USM for service. (Delivered to USM 4/17/2014.) Clerk shall send USM-285 form, and one copy of the papers submitted in this action, to plaintiff. (U.S. Mail to P 4/17/2014.) Plaintiff shall have 20 days to furnish USM with USM-285 form. Plaintiff must file a motion re any unserved defendant. Henceforth plaintiff shall serve defendants a copy of every paper submitted for consideration by the Court together with a certificate of service. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/16/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robinson v. Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirt D. Robinson
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?