United States of America v. $11,800.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $11,800.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2014cv00172
Filed: April 1, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying # 21 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE against $11,800.00 in United States Currency and against all persons and/or entities, having any interest in such property. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 12 Motion to Strike 11 Answer to Complaint in Forfeiture. Clerk directed to strike 11 Answer. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER FOR SUMMONS AND WARRANT OF ARREST IN REM FOR PROPERTY re 3 Proposed Order Submission. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $11,800.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $11,800.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?