United States of America v. $40,200.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $40,200.00 in United States Currency
Claimant: Erik L. Christensen
Case Number: 3:2014cv00229
Filed: April 30, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881 Forfeiture Property-Drugs
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 59 JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE granting # 58 Motion for Entry of Judgment of Forfeiture. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 8/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's # 55 Report and Recommendation entered on June 22, 2015, is adopted and accepted, and claimant Erik L. Christensen's # 14 amended answer is hereby STRICKEN. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that default judgment of forfeiture is hereby ENTERED in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 37(b)(2)(A)(iii) and (vi). Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 7/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER re # 41 Objection, # 49 Response : The court orders that the claimant, Erik Christensen shall pay the sum of $2,368.00 in attorney's fees to the United States within 30 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 6/22/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying 37 Motion to Dismiss and denying as moot 33 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 5/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER re 36 Declaration re Fees and Expenses filed by United States of America : The court finds the sum of $2,368.00 to be reasonable attorney's fees. However, before the court order payment of those fees to plaintiff, it shall issue a separate order to Bruce Lindsay, Esq. to show cause why he should not also be responsible for payment of some or all of this sanction. Thereafter the court will issue a final order concerning how the payment of attorney's fees will be apportioned, if at all, between the claimant and Mr. Lindsay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/5/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 4/15/2015, denying Claimant's 40 Motion to Strike. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $40,200.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $40,200.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Erik L. Christensen
Represented By: Robert Bruce Lindsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?