Mosby v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Marvin Mosby
Respondent: Attorney General and Renee Baker
Case Number: 3:2014cv00251
Filed: May 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDERED that the petition (ECF No. 24 ) is denied in its entirety.It is further ordered that a certificate of appealability is denied. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that respondents' motion for extension of time to file an answer to the petition (ECF No. 45 ) is granted nunc pro tunc; petitioner's motion for extension of time to file a reply in support of the answer (ECF No. 47 ) is granted nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER - Respondents must file a response to the petition, by 4/17/2019; Petitioner's Reply due 30 days thereafter. (See pdf order for specifics.) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDERED that respondents' motion to dismiss (ECF No. 28 ) the petition is granted. The petition is dismissed as time-barred. Respondents' motion for leave to file exhibit under seal (ECF No. 30 ) is granted. Petitioner's motion for extension of time to file an opposition to the motion to dismiss (ECF No. 32 ) is granted nunc pro tunc. A certificate of appealability is denied. The Clerk enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting ECF No. 19 Motion to Reopen Case and directing Clerk to reopen this matter; directing counsel for Petitioner to meet with Petitioner as soon as reasonably possible. Amended petition due within 75 days, response due 30 days th ereafter, and reply due 30 days after response. Any state court exhibits shall be filed with separate index. Hard copies of any exhibits shall be forwarded to staff attorneys in Reno. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 7/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 14 motion for stay and abeyance; denying as moot 12 and 13 motions for extension of time; staying this action pending final resolution of petitioner's post-conviction habeas petition; directing Clerk to administratively close this action. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/11/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 6, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Motion for extension of time 8 is granted nunc prop tunc. FPD appointed as counsel. Petitioner shall have 120 days to file amended petition (please see attached for further details/deadlines). Hard copy of exhibits shall be delivered - for this case - to the Reno Clerk's Office. Clerk shall send copy of this order to petitioner at ESP (sent via USPS 8/6/14). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/6/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FPD provisionally appointed subject to petitioner, within 30 days, submitting current inmate account statement. FPD shall have 30 days to undertake representation or to indicate inability to do so. Clerk shall add AG's Office as co unsel for respondents. Respondents' counsel shall enter notice of appearance within 21 days, but no further response required until further order. Petitioner's pending motions 2 and 5 are denied without prejudice. The Clerk shall se nd copy of order to petitioner (with copy of petition), the AG, the FPD, and CJA coordinator (sent by USPS/served via NEF 6/19/2014). Clerk shall regenerate NEFs of all prior filings to AG and FPD (accomplished 6/19/2014). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 23, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Within 30 days, petitioner shall show cause in writing why petition should not be dismissed with prejudice as time-barred. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/23/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mosby v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marvin Mosby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?