Coleman v. LeGrand et al
Petitioner: |
Melvin Charles Coleman, Jr. |
Respondent: |
Robert LeGrand and Nevada Attorney General |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv00337 |
Filed: |
June 26, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Valerie P. Cooke |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert C. Jones |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 18, 2017 |
Filing
32
JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 9/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
February 11, 2015 |
Filing
21
ORDER granting nunc pro tunc 16 motion to extend time; granting 19 motion for leave to file under seal; directing Respondents to file a response to the 18 second amended petition within 90 days (by 5/12/2015). Petitioner to reply within 30 days thereafter. Any additional exhibits shall be filed with separate index. Hard copies of any exhibits shall be forwarded - for this case - to the staff attorneys in Reno. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/11/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing
15
ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave and Extension to File. (Second Amended Petition due by 12/9/2014.) Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/21/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
September 10, 2014 |
Filing
9
ORDER FPD appointed as counsel for petitioner, with Jonathan M. Kirshbaum, Esq., appearing as petitioner's counsel of record. Amended Petition due within 30 days. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/9/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
July 15, 2014 |
Filing
3
ORDER Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis 1 is granted. Clerk shall file petition and accompanying motion for appointment of counsel. Motion for appointment of counsel is granted. FPD provisionally app ointed and shall have 30 days to undertake representation or indicate inability to do so. Clerk shall add AG as counsel for respondents. Respondents' counsel shall enter notice of appearance within 21 days, but no further response required. Counsel shall send hard copy of exhibits, for this case, to the Reno Clerk's Office. Clerk shall send copy of this order to petitioner (along with copy of papers submitted), AG, FPD, and CJA Coordinator (sent via NEF or USPS 7/16/14). Clerk shall regenerate NEFS of prior filings to AG and FPD. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/15/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?