Flowers v. Baca et al
Plaintiff: John Flowers
Defendant: Isidro Baca, Dr. Bannister, Ronald Centric, Greg Cox, J. Harris, Terri Jacobs, John F. Keast, Dr. Stone and Lisa Walsh
Case Number: 3:2014cv00366
Filed: July 15, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 50 Motion to Extend Time : Second Amended Complaint due by Monday 6/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER that Defendants' motion requesting that the court screen the FAC (ECF No. 47 ) is GRANTED; the FAC (ECF No. 43 ) is DISMISSED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND; Plaintiff has 30 days from the date of this order to file a second amended complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Deadline to File Amended Complaint (ECF No. 40 ) is GRANTED; the hearing set for 9/17/2019 (ECF No. 41 ) is VACATED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - The motion for appointment of a guardian ad litem (ECF No. 25 ) is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the remaining motions (ECF Nos. 26 , 32 ) are DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that Flowers shall file an amended complaint by 10/2/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER that amended complaint is due by 2/8/2018; clerk directed to send Plaintiff the approved form for filing a § 1983 complaint, instructions and a copy of ECF No. 6 complaint (mailed to P on 1/12/2018); and the case is removed from the Pilot Pro Bono Program and will proceed on the normal litigation track. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/11/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re 9 , 12 Notice of Appeal (USCA Case 14-16932). The appeal would be taken "in good faith". Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/21/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; copy sent via NEF to USCA - JC)
September 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 9/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flowers v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Bannister
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Centric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terri Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John F. Keast
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Flowers
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?