Cross v. Baker et al
Petitioner: Anthony Cross
Respondent: Renee Baker and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2014cv00434
Filed: August 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER that petitioner's motion requesting court order ECF No. 54 is DENIED as moot; petitioner's motion requesting court docket sheets ECF No. 56 is GRANTED; Clerk directed to send petitioner a copy of the docket sheet for this action (mailed on 9/24/2018). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that ECF No. 4 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is DENIED; Clerk directed to enter judgment accordingly and close this action; certificate of appealability is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/09/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDERED that respondents file their exhibit 17 under seal within fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting in part 37 motion to alter or amend judgment and/or motion for reconsideration. Ground 2 is dismissed in its entirety. The part of 36 Order requiring petitioner to file election with regard to ground 2 is vacated. Respondents shall have 45 days to file and serve answer. Petitioner shall have 45 days thereafter to file reply. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
September 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 13 motion to voluntarily dismiss ground six; granting in part 18 motion to dismiss (due-process claim in ground 2 is dismissed; equal-protection claim in ground 2 is unexhausted); denying 14 motion for order directing respondents to produce recording of disciplinary hearing; and denying 31 motion requesting leave of the court to conduct discovery and an evidentiary hearing. Petitioner shall have 30 days to inform the court of his decision re equal-protection claim in ground 2. Please see attached for additional details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
December 31, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERED that P's # 7 Motion to alter or amend judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that P's # 9 Request for issuance of certificate of appealability (#9) is DENIED FURTHER ORDERED that Rs' # 11 Motion for enlargement of time is GRANTED : Answer/response to petition due by 1/7/2015. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cross v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?