Contreras v. Backer et al
Petitioner: Gustavo Contreras
Respondent: Renee Backer and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2014cv00435
Filed: August 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus (ECF Nos. 3 / 36 ) is DENIED; Clerk directed to enter judgment accordingly; a certificate of appealability is denied. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 11/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER that petitioner's "motion to alter or amend judgment" (ECF No. 49 ) is DENIED; petitioner's motion for extension of time (ECF No. 53 ) is GRANTED nunc pro tunc as of April 27, 2018. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER that ECF No. 37 respondents' motion to dismiss is GRANTED; ECF No. 39 petitioner's motion for leave to file a supplement to his petition is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; respondents answer due by 4/15/2018; and ECF Nos. 40 and 42 respondents' motions for extension of time are GRANTED nunc pro tunc. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting ECF No. 32 Motion to Reopen Case, lifting stay; denying ECF No. 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Respondents' responses to ECF No. 3 Petition due within 60 days. Reply due within 45 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 4/25/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER - # 22 Motion for stay and abeyance is GRANTED. This action is STAYED pending exhaustion. Grant of stay is conditioned upon P proceeding in state court and returning within 45 days of issuance of remittitur. Clerk shall administratively close this action until such time as court grant s motion to reopen. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 10/28/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss (see order for details); granting 18 Motion to Add Additional Exhibit. Petitioner to have 30 days to either: (1) inform the Court that he wishes to abandon the unexhau sted grounds; (2) inform the Court that he wants to dismiss this petition to return to state court to exhaust his unexhausted claims; or (3) file a motion for a stay, asking this court to hold his exhausted claims in abeyance while he returns to stat e court to exhaust his unexhausted claims. If Petitioner elects to abandon his unexhausted grounds, Respondents to have 30 days from Petitioner's declaration of abandonment to answer; Petitioner to reply 30 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 6/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Contreras v. Backer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Renee Backer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gustavo Contreras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?