Ramet v. LeGrande et al
Petitioner: Daniel A. Ramet
Respondent: Robert LeGrande and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2014cv00452
Filed: August 28, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER that ECF No. 9 Ramet's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied; Clerk directed to enter judgment; and a certificate of appealability is granted. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 20 Motion to Dismiss; denying ECF No. 24 Motion for an Evidentiary Hearing; giving Petitioner 20 days to notify the Court re the unexhausted Claim 10. Respondents to answer remaining grounds for relief within 30 days of Petitioner's declaration; Petitioner to reply within 30 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 9/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing Counsel for petitioner to meet with petitioner as soon as reasonably possible. Petitioner to file and serve an amended petition within 90 days; respondents to respond within 30 days thereafter; petitioner to reply within 30 days of response. Any state court exhibits shall be filed with separate index. Hard copies of any exhibits shall be forwarded to the staff attorneys in Reno. (Amended Petition due by 4/9/2015.) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/9/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER - # 1 IFP application is granted. Clerk shall file the petition. # 1 -2 Motion for counsel is granted. FPD appointed as counsel for P. Clerk shall e-serve FPD this order with a copy of petition and its attachments. ( E-service 12/8/2014. ) F PD shall undertake representation by 1/7/2015, or indicate inability to do so. Clerk shall send copy to CJA Coordinator. ( NEF service 12/8/2014. ) Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/8/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 12/8/2014 to reflect copy of Order mailed to P at LCC (DRM).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramet v. LeGrande et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert LeGrande
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daniel A. Ramet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?