Villatoro v. LeGrand et al
Petitioner: |
Balmore Alexander Villatoro |
Respondent: |
Robert LeGrand and Nevada Attorney General |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv00467 |
Filed: |
September 10, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Cobb |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert C. Jones |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 6, 2018 |
Filing
39
ORDERED that the amended petition (ECF No. 9 ) is DENIED in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 16, 2017 |
Filing
31
ORDERED that petitioner's motion for stay and abeyance (ECF No. 28 ) is DENIED. P shall file sworn declaration re abandonment or dismissal of unexhausted claims by 3/18/2017. If P elects to abandon then answer to remaining grounds due 30 days from service of declaration; Reply due 30 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/16/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
March 4, 2016 |
Filing
25
ORDER granting in part 17 Motion to Dismiss: Ground 2 is unexhausted. Petitioner to have 30 days to notify the Court re the unexhausted claims. If Petitioner elects to abandon the unexhausted grounds, Respondents to have 30 days from Petit ioner's declaration of abandonment to answer remaining grounds; Petitioner to reply 30 days thereafter. Respondents' 23 Motion to Extend Time is granted nunc pro tunc. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/3/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
October 21, 2014 |
Filing
8
ORDER Counsel for petitioner shall meet with petitioner as soon as possible to review items as listed in attached order. Amended Petition due by 4/10/2015. Please see attached for further details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/21/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?