Weinfeld et al v. Minor et al
Plaintiff: Hannah Cohen, Congregation Beth Joseph, Colonel Robert Frank, Michael Friedman, David Goldstein, Albert Isaac, Carl Isaac, Gerald B. Katz, Jacob Kellner, Liana Knijnikova, Josef Kohn, Yehudah Nussbaum, Solomon Schlarfrig, David Schwartz, Moses Steinmetz, Joseph Weinfeld and Isaac Weiss
Defendant: Walter A. Marting, Jr., Bill L. Minor, Precious Minerals Mining and Refining Corp. and John H. Reynolds
Case Number: 3:2014cv00513
Filed: October 3, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Stockholders Suits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER that Defendants' Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs ECF No. 160 is GRANTED; Defendants' are awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $179,747.50 and non-taxable costs and paralegal fees in the amount of $39,218.15; that Plaintiffs' Motion for Re-Taxation of Costs ECF No. 186 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER that the Plaintiffs Motion to Strike (ECF No. 181 ) is GRANTED IN PART. The Plaintiffs have until 1/28/2019 to file a surreply. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER granting ECF No. 189 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Plaintiffs' reply to ECF Nos. 183 Motion to Strike and 186 Motion for Re-Taxation of Costs are due by 8/27/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER granting ECF No. 178 Stipulation to Extend the Deadline for Defendant to Reply to ECF No. 160 Motion for Attorney Fees. Reply due by 6/26/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER granting ECF No. 174 Stipulation to Extend Plaintiffs' Time to file response to ECF No. 160 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs (Second Request). Response due by 5/29/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER granting ECF No. 172 Stipulation to Extend Plaintiffs' Time to File an Opposition to ECF No. 160 Defendants' Motion for Fees and Costs. Response/opposition due by 5/22/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER granting ECF No. 133 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 139 Motion for Summary Judgment; directing Clerk to enter judgment and close case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MINUTE ORDER in Chambers of Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/12/2018 - ECF No. 148 Motion to withdraw as counsel is GRANTED. ORDERED that Defendants Bill L. Minor, John H. Reynolds, and Walter A. Marting, Jr., are hereafter appeari ng pro se. All further documents in this case will be served as follows: Bill L. Minor c/o Precious Minerals Mining & Refining Corp. Post Office Box 270 Fairview Village, PA 19409-0270 John H. Reynolds 7971 North 53rd Ave. , Apt. 332 Glendale, AZ 85301 Walter A. Marting, Jr. 6900 S. McCarran Blvd., #1010 Reno, Nevada 89590 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Precious Minerals Mining and Refining Corp. shall file a substitution of counsel within thirty (30) days of this order, i.e., on or before Friday, April 13, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this order and all documents filed until Defendant Precious Minerals Mining and Refining Corp. obtains counsel shall be served on Preci ous Minerals Mining and Refining Corp. via regular mail at the following address: Precious Minerals Mining and Refining Corp. Post Office Box 270 Fairview Village, PA 19409-0270 (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER that the Motion in Limine ECF No. 131 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 07/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 115 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 3/1/2017. Before the court is the parties' Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadlines (Fourth Request) 114 . The parties outline the procedural history of the case including the multiple extensions of the discovery deadline this court has approved in the past. The last extension was approved in ECF No. 112, wherein the court indicated that "There shall be no further extensions granted." (Id ., at 3). The parties' stipulation fails to note this admonition. The court is not inclined to grant a discovery extension because of the parties' issues in completing discovery; their discovery should have been undertaken and c ompleted within the time parameters the court authorized on December 19, 2016 112 . Nevertheless, the medical issues confronting Defendants' counsel (ECF No. 114 at 2) provides good cause for what the court will grant as a final extension. Th e court has to manage its docket and further delays in completing discovery will be unacceptable. The following deadlines are imposed in this matter: Discovery Cut-off Date: Wednesday, May 31, 2017; Disclosure of Expert Testimony: F riday, March 31, 2017; Disclosure of Rebuttal Experts: Monday, May 1, 2017; Dispositive Motions: Friday, June 30, 2017; Proposed Joint Pre-trial Order: Monday, July 31, 2017. In the event that dispositive motions are filed, the date for filing the joint pretrial order shall be suspended until 30 days after the decision on the dispositive motions. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 92 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART, with leave to amend in part. (see pdf order for specifics) Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 99 VACATED PER #[101 ] ORDER : ORDERED that the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 92 ) and the Motion to Seal (ECF No. 95 ) are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 6/29/2016 to fix hyperlink (DRM). Modified on 6/29/2016 to denote VACATED. (DRM).
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting 57 Motion to Dismiss, with leave to amend. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/8/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting 70 Stipulation for Substitution of Attorney : Christina H. Bost Seaton in the place and stead of Troutman Sanders LLP, for Bill L. Minor. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting 57 Motion to Dismiss. Clerk shall enter judgment and close case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 13 and 16 Motions to Dismiss, with leave to amend. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/26/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER indicating that the Court will issue a ruling in due course (see order for details). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned Judge recuses himself from this action. This action is referred to Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro for reassignment. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/18/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Weinfeld et al v. Minor et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hannah Cohen
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Congregation Beth Joseph
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colonel Robert Frank
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Friedman
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Goldstein
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Albert Isaac
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Isaac
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald B. Katz
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Kellner
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liana Knijnikova
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josef Kohn
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yehudah Nussbaum
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Solomon Schlarfrig
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Schwartz
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moses Steinmetz
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Weinfeld
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Isaac Weiss
Represented By: Chaim Z. Appel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walter A. Marting, Jr.
Represented By: Christina Heather Bost Seaton
Represented By: Michael J Morrison
Represented By: Aurora cassirer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill L. Minor
Represented By: Christina Heather Bost Seaton
Represented By: Michael J Morrison
Represented By: Aurora cassirer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Precious Minerals Mining and Refining Corp.
Represented By: Christina Heather Bost Seaton
Represented By: Michael J Morrison
Represented By: Aurora cassirer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John H. Reynolds
Represented By: Christina Heather Bost Seaton
Represented By: Michael J Morrison
Represented By: Aurora cassirer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?