Harris v. Baker et al
Petitioner: |
Conor James Harris |
Respondent: |
Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Renee Baker |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv00516 |
Filed: |
October 6, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Cobb |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert C. Jones |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 6, 2017 |
Filing
36
ORDERED that respondents' motion to dismiss the first-amended petition (ECF No. 21 ) is GRANTED. The petition is DISMISSED as untimely. FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that petitio ner's motion for leave to file an opposition in excess of the page limit (ECF No. 27 ) is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents' motion for extension of time to file a reply in support of the motion to dismiss (ECF No. 34 ) is GRANTED nunc pro tunc. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
February 19, 2015 |
Filing
9
ORDER FPD appointed as counsel for petitioner, with Melanie Gavisk, Esq., appearing as petitioner's counsel of record. Petitioner shall have 120 days to file amended petition. Parties shall send courtesy copies of all exhibits to Reno Division of this court. Please see attached for additional details and deadlines. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
January 9, 2015 |
Filing
5
ORDER directing Clerk to file the 1 -1 petition and 1 -2 motion for appointment of counsel; granting the motion for appointment of counsel and appointing the FPD to represent petitioner; directing Clerk to e-serve the FPD a copy of this order and the petition (NEFs sent 1/9/2015). FPD to enter notice of appearance within 30 days. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/9/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?