Manley v. Baker et al
Petitioner: |
Charles Stephen Manley |
Respondent: |
Renee Baker and Nevada Attorney General |
Case Number: |
3:2014cv00580 |
Filed: |
November 13, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Valerie P. Cooke |
Presiding Judge: |
Robert C. Jones |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 28, 2018 |
Filing
33
ORDERED that this action shall be dismissed without prejudice and that the pending response deadline under ECF No. 31 is canceled. The Clerk of Court shall enter final judgment accordingly, dismissing this action without prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
August 14, 2018 |
Filing
31
ORDER that respondents shall file a supplemental exhibit including the missing pages from the trial transcript by 9/4/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
March 6, 2017 |
Filing
30
ORDERED that petitioner's third motion for appointment of counsel (ECF NO. 27 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's motion to stay the case (ECF No. 28 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall file his reply in support of his petition by 5/5/2017. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
April 12, 2016 |
Filing
25
ORDER granting 24 Motion to Extend Time re 23 Answer to 4 Petition. Petitioner's reply due within 90 days. Absent extraordinary circumstances, the Court is highly unlikely to grant any further extensions. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
January 27, 2016 |
Filing
21
ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss, dismissing Grounds 4, 5, and 7(b) as procedurally barred; giving Respondents 60 days to answer remaining grounds. Petitioner to reply within 30 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
|
January 20, 2015 |
Filing
3
ORDER granting 1 IFP application; directing Clerk to file and e-serve 1 -1 petition on respondents (NEF sent 1/20/2015); directing Clerk to file, and denying, 1 -2 motion for appointment of counsel; directing Cl erk to file, and granting, 1 -3 motion to extend copywork limit, $20 to be used in this proceeding only. Respondents to respond to petition with 90 days; Petitioner to reply within 30 days thereafter. Any exhibits shall be filed with separate index. Hard copies of any exhibits shall be forwarded, for this case, to staff attorneys in Reno. See order for further details. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; copy also sent to NDOC Chief of Inmate Services - KR) Modified on 1/20/2015 (KR).
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?