Strohmeyer v. Belanger et al
Plaintiff: Jeremy Joseph Strohmeyer
Defendant: Beguefuth, K. Belanger, Board of Prison, Michael Bobadilla, Tara Carpenter, C. Cartier, Cathrine Masto Cortez, Dwayne Deal, S. L. Foster, James Fox, Starlin Gentry, M. Gilder, James Keener, Robert LeGrand, Secretary of State Ross Miller, Nevada Department of Corrections, Nevada, State Of, Valaree Olivas, C. Ruiz, C. Rutherford, Sandy, C. Schardin, S. Sisco, Adam Vallaster, Michael Ward, Whiteman and John Whiting
Case Number: 3:2014cv00661
Filed: December 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER - United States Magistrate Judge Cobb's Report and Recommendation (ECF No. 371 ) is adopted and accepted. Plaintiff's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 355 ) is stricken. Doe Defendants are dismissed w ithout prejudice. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 337 ) is granted. Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal (ECF No. 338 ) is granted. Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. [3 43]) is denied. This Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the remaining state law deprivation of property claims in Count XII and the assault and battery claims in Count XV. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (ECF No. 372 ) is granted. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER - Defendant Koree Kirkpatrick is DISMISSED without prejudice for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the Court's Notice of Intention to Dismiss (ECF No. 367 ) pursuant to FRCP 4(m). Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER - Plaintiff's Objections (ECF Nos. 305 , 345 , 362 ) and Motion for Preliminary Conference (ECF No. 323 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/9/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 347 ORDER - Plaintiff's Objections to Magistrate Order (ECF Nos. 254 , 256 , 266 , 270 , 272 ) are DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/8/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 312 ORDER Plaintiff's Motion (No. ECF 296 ) is granted in part and denied in part consistent with this order. (See order for specifics.) DAG Rands shall arrange for a meet and confer conference to take place within five business days of this order. (5/11/2020) Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 301 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion to File Late Motion (ECF No. 299 ) and Motion for Order to Compel (ECF No. 300 ) are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 294 ORDER denying ECF Nos. 274 , 275 , 283 , 284 , 289 , 290 , 291 and 292 Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LW)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER granting ECF No. 281 Motion to Extend Time as follows: - Dispositive Motions due by Monday, May 4, 2020 Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AB)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER - Plaintiff's Objection/Appeal to Magistrate Order 150 (ECF No. 160 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff's Objection/Appeal to Magistrate Order 153 (ECF No. 164 ) is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff's Objection/Appeal to M agistrate Order 196 (ECF No. 208 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Objection/Appeal to Magistrate Order 198 (ECF No. 209 ) is DENIED. Plaintiff's Objection/Appeal to Magistrate Order 232 (ECF No. 233 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER - Plaintiff shall be given an additional thirty (30) days from the date of this order within which to file an opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 226 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 11/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to compel (ECF Nos. 147 , 149 , 150 & 175 ) is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/28/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 191 ORDER that Plaintiff is allowed to serve Defendants Jenkins/Armstead by publication in the Nevada Appeal, Defendant Keener via the Nevada Appeal/Lahontan Valley News and Defendant Miranda in the Reno Gazette-Journal; Clerk direct ed to issue new summonses for the three defendants and mail them to the Plaintiff for his service by publication (Mailed to P on 8/28/2019); Clerk also directed to mail copies of the Summons and Third Amended Complaint to each of the Defendant s at their respective addresses contained in Defendants' filings of last known addresses for these Defendants (ECF No. 157 ) (Mailed to Defendants on 8/28/2019); Clerk directed to file a Notice that the mailings were effected to the three (3) Defendants upon completion. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER re ECF No. 153 Order, clarifying that the conclusion should read that Plaintiff may proceed in Count IV with the First Amendment mail tampering claim against Jenkins and Bequette, and against the unidentified mailroom officers if substituted within the parameters of the operative scheduling order and Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to correct errors (ECF No. 163 ) is GRANTED as specified herein. AG shall file a Notice by 8/20/2019 re acceptance of service as to Cartier, Gilder and Schardin. If service not accepted the AG shall fi le under seal, but not serve Plaintiff, the last known addresses of those defendants. Answer/response to Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 120 ) due by 9/5/2019. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with Count XII, he must file a simple motion by 8/27/201 9. To the extent this Order has any impact on the answer to the Third Amended Complaint previously filed by the Defendants, the Defendants may file an amended answer by 9/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER that the Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 120 ) is the operative complaint and will proceed as outlined herein order; the TAC will NOT proceed on the claims outlined herein order or as to the parties which were already dismissed with prejudice from this action; the AG shall file a notice by 7/16/2019 re acceptance of service and/or provide last-known-address information under seal; answer/response due within 30 days for any defendants represented; the court will address the stay of deadlines and scheduling order as well as Plaintiff's requests to serve defendants named in prior iterations of the complaint by publication at the status conference set for August 14, 2019. See order for further details and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 7/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER GRANTING ECF No. 143 Motion to Extend Time : Defendants shall have to and including July 30, 2019, in which to respond to Plaintiff's requests for the production of documents submitted to Dwayne Deal. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 6/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying Plaintiff's ECF Nos. 100 , 101 , and 108 Objections. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/29/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 132 Motion to Extend Time - Plaintiff's deadline to effect service on the listed defendants extended to 7/23/2019; directing Defendants to respond to ECF Nos. 131 , 133 , 134 , and 135 Motions to Serve by Publication by 5/6/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 4/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting ECF No. 127 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Requests for the Production of Documents Submitted to David Carpenter, Christopher Cartier, and David Bequette (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying 107 Plaintiff's Motion for Service by Publication and 123 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 118 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Service - deadline extended to 5/17/2019; granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 110 Motion to Amend, directing Clerk to file proposed Third Amended C omplaint; staying the discovery and dispositive motion deadlines set forth in ECF No. 81 Scheduling Order; denying as moot Plaintiff's ECF No. 113 Motion to Extend Discovery Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 2/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTE ORDER - Plaintiff's motions for defaults (ECF Nos. 85 , 86 , 87 , and 88 ) are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting ECF No. 71 Motion to Extend Time : Answer/response to Complaint due by 11/26/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 9/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AMENDED ORDER re ECF No. 51 Order denying Motion to Reconsider . Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 8/7/2018 to correct text (DRM).
August 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that Clerk shall electronically SERVE NV AG with a copy of this order and a copy of ECF No. 33 Plaintiff's second amended complaint (E-service and NEF regenerated on 8/2/2018); service must be perfected by 10/31/2018; AG to advise Court by 8/23/2018 re acceptance of service and/or provide last-known-address information under seal; plaintiff to file a motion identifying the unserved defendant(s), requesting issuance of a summons, and specifying a full name and ad dress for the defendant(s); answer/response due due within 60 days for any defendants represented; Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service; this case is no longer stayed. See order for further details and instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 8/2/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying Plaintiff's ECF No. 49 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying Plaintiff's ECF No. 39 Motion for Screening; denying Plaintiff's ECF No. 41 Motion for Screening or Transfer. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying Plaintiff's ECF No. 32 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER giving Plaintiff 30 days to file second amended complaint curing deficiencies of amended complaint; directing Clerk to send Plaintiff 1983 form, instructions, copy of ECF No. 9 Amended Complaint, and copy of ECF No. 15 USCA Memorand um (mailed 10/18/2016). If Plaintiff chooses not to file second amended complaint, action shall proceed on the following (see order for details). Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) Modified on 10/18/2016 to clarify (KR).
May 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCREENING ORDER granting 4 motion requesting leave to file a new IFP application; granting 5 IFP application; granting 7 motion to file an amended complaint; directing Clerk to file the 7 -1 amended complaint; d ismissing in its entirety with prejudice the amended complaint; certifying that any IFP appeal would be taken "in good faith" pursuant to 28 USC 1915(a)(3); directing Clerk to enter judgment accordingly. Payment of an initial in stallment of filing fee not required. NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account. The Clerk shall send a copy of this order to NDOC Chief of Inmate Services (mailed 5/7/2015; NEF also sent to USDC Finance Dept). See order for further details. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/7/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strohmeyer v. Belanger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beguefuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Belanger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Bobadilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tara Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Cartier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathrine Masto Cortez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. L. Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starlin Gentry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Gilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Keener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Ross Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada, State Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valaree Olivas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Rutherford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Schardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Sisco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Vallaster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whiteman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Whiting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremy Joseph Strohmeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?