Schemenauer v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Cynthia L. Schemenauer
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested Party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2015cv00001
Filed: January 2, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER ADOPTING AND ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ECF No. 40 . IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Request for Reimbursement of Fees ECF No. 35 is GRANTED and Plaintiff is awarded costs in the amount of $532.17; the Commissioner's request to strike Plaintiff's submission is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 01/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - The # 30 Report and Recommendation is adopted and accepted, and plaintiff's # 14 Motion to Remand to Social Security Administration is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's # 16 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is D ENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is remanded to the ALJ for further proceedings consistent with the # 30 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING # 12 Motion to Seal : Clerk shall SEND the Commissioner's counsel a copy of the medical records contained within ECF No. 13 . ( Mailed to AUSA 12/2/2015; with copy of instant Order. ) The Commissioner has TEN DAYS from th e date it receives the medical records filed under seal by Plaintiff to file a response addressing those documents. Plaintiff shall have SEVEN DAYS from the date that response is filed to file a reply addressing only the comments contained in the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schemenauer v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Represented By: Donna W. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia L. Schemenauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?