Schemenauer v. Colvin
Plaintiff: |
Cynthia L. Schemenauer |
Defendant: |
Carolyn W. Colvin |
Interested Party: |
Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00001 |
Filed: |
January 2, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Cobb |
Presiding Judge: |
Larry R. Hicks |
Nature of Suit: |
Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 205 Denial Social Security Benefits |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 31, 2017 |
Filing
41
ORDER ADOPTING AND ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS ECF No. 40 . IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff's Request for Reimbursement of Fees ECF No. 35 is GRANTED and Plaintiff is awarded costs in the amount of $532.17; the Commissioner's request to strike Plaintiff's submission is DENIED. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 01/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
|
March 22, 2016 |
Filing
31
ORDER - The # 30 Report and Recommendation is adopted and accepted, and plaintiff's # 14 Motion to Remand to Social Security Administration is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's # 16 Cross Motion for Summary Judgment is D ENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that this matter is remanded to the ALJ for further proceedings consistent with the # 30 Report and Recommendation. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 3/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
December 1, 2015 |
Filing
25
ORDER GRANTING # 12 Motion to Seal : Clerk shall SEND the Commissioner's counsel a copy of the medical records contained within ECF No. 13 . ( Mailed to AUSA 12/2/2015; with copy of instant Order. ) The Commissioner has TEN DAYS from th e date it receives the medical records filed under seal by Plaintiff to file a response addressing those documents. Plaintiff shall have SEVEN DAYS from the date that response is filed to file a reply addressing only the comments contained in the response. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?