Sudberry vs Baca et al
Plaintiff: Dennis K. Sudberry
Defendant: Isidro Baca, Shannon Moyle, R. Schreckengost and Lisa Walsh
Case Number: 3:2015cv00013
Filed: January 13, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying as moot 21 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/1/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice; directing Clerk to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/22/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDERED that # 1 -2) IFP Application is DENIED without prejudice to file a new application. FURTHER ORD that the Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND Plaintiff approved IFP form w instructions. ( Electronically transmitted to P at NNCC via separate tran smittal. ) FURTHER ORD P shall either file fully complete IFP form, or pay the $400 filing fee by 2/13/2015. FURTHER ORD Clerk shall retain the complaint but not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sudberry vs Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Moyle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Schreckengost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis K. Sudberry
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?