McNair v. Walsh et al

Plaintiff: Clarence McNair
Defendant: V. Atwood, Isidro Baca, N. Hughes, R. Kersten and Lisa Walsh
Case Number: 3:2015cv00017
Filed: January 13, 2015
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Reno Office
Referring Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order 56 ORDER denying ECF No. 53 Motion to Reconsider; granting ECF No. 54 Motion to Extend Time. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order 51 ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendations ECF No. 35 is ADOPTED AND ACCEPTED. The Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 28 is GRANTED. Clerk directed to enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 06/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order 25 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 1 IFP application - NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account (copy of order sent to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services); directing Clerk to e-serve NV AG with this order and ECF No. 19 Second Ame nded Complaint (NEFs sent 10/11/2016); directing AG to advise Court within 21 days re acceptance of service. Answer due within 60 days for any defendants represented. Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/11/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order 18 ORDER dismissing 9 Amended Complaint, with leave to amend within 28 days. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR) Modified on 1/26/2016 to correct filed date (KR).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNair v. Walsh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Atwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Kersten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clarence McNair
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?