Martin v. Baca et al
Petitioner: Richard W. Martin
Respondent: Isidro Baca and Nevada Attorney General
Case Number: 3:2015cv00036
Filed: January 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 JUDGMENT. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 16 Motion to Dismiss (see order for details); granting ECF No. 28 Motion to Withdraw ECF No. 27 Exhibit; giving Petitioner 30 days to notify the Court re the unexhau sted grounds. If Petitioner elects to abandon unexhausted grounds, Respondents to file an answer within 30 days of Petitioner's declaration. Petitioner to reply within 30 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Petitioner's # 32 Motion for relief from judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall not seek further reconsideration of the court's # 13 Order denying motion for counsel. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner's # 33 Motion to extend time is GRANTED : Petitioner shall file and serve his opposition to # 16 Motion by 3/25/2016. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/25/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER denying 14 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order; granting nunc pro tunc 15 Motion to Extend Time; granting 17 Motion to Seal; and granting 30 Motion to Extend Time to Oppose 16 Motion to Dismiss. Response due within 60 days. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDERED that the Clerk shall FILE and ELECTRONICALLY SERVE the petition (# 1 -1) on respondents. (E-service to AG on 6/2/2015.) FURTHER ORD answer/response to petition due by 90 days from service of petition. FURTHER ORD reply due 30 days from service of answer. FURTHER ORD any additional state court exhibits shall be filed as specified herein. FURTHER ORD Clerk SHALL REFUND petitioner his $5.00 duplicate filing fee. (E-notice to Finance on 6/2/2015.) FURTHER ORD that petitioner's # 3 Motion for file-stamped copy of his petition is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/1/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Baca et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Nevada Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Richard W. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?