Hill v. Rowley et al
Plaintiff: Rickie L. Hill
Defendant: C. Rowley and K. Spiers
Case Number: 3:2015cv00038
Filed: January 20, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER granting ECF No. 115 Motion to Stipulate; the parties shall file the Joint Pre-Trial Order on or before, 5:00 P.M., Friday, October 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/20/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation ECF No. 112 is ADOPTED and ACCEPTED; Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 104 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER granting ECF No. 97 Motion for Enlargement of Time to File Dispositive Motion. Dispositive Motions due by 12/21/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin Carry on 11/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER the Report and Recommendation ECF No. 90 should be ADOPTED and ACCEPTED; Plaintiff's motions ECF Nos. 69 , 70 , 77 , 83 , 84 and 89 are DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER adopting ECF No. 47 Report and Recommendation; granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 24 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying ECF No. 43 Motion for Recusal; denying ECF No. 49 Motion to Strike; denying ECF No. 30 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting Plaintiff's ECF No. 1 IFP application - NDOC to pay Clerk from inmate account (copy of order sent to Finance and NDOC Chief of Inmate Services); directing Clerk to e-serve NV AG with this order and ECF No. 5 Complaint ( NEFs sent 3/2/2017). AG to advise Court within 21 days re service. Answer due within 60 days for any defendants represented. Plaintiff shall serve defendants copy of all pleadings and include certificate of service. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 3/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER giving Plaintiff 30 days to file an amended complaint curing deficiencies of the complaint; directing Clerk to send Plaintiff 1983 form, instructions, copy of ECF No. 5 Complaint, and a copy of ECF No. 13 USCA Memorandum (mailed 10/ 18/2016). If Plaintiff chooses not to file amended complaint, action shall proceed only on the sexual harassment and equal protection claims against Rowley for unwanted touching of Plaintiff's person. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting 1 IFP application; directing Clerk to detach and file 1 -1 complaint; dismissing complaint; directing Clerk to enter judgment and close case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/24/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hill v. Rowley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rickie L. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Rowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Spiers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?