GMAT Legal Title Trust 2013-1, by U.S. Bank v. Fitchner et al
Plaintiff: GMAT Legal Title Trust 2013-1, by U.S. Bank, National Association as Legal Title Trustee
Defendant: Bank of America N.A, James W. Fitchner, Rainbow Bend Homeowners Association, Norene M. Vickers and Sandra A. White
Case Number: 3:2015cv00044
Filed: January 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting ECF No. 118 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to ECF No. 117 Objection to Bill of Costs. Response due by 7/27/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 7/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER granting ECF No. 103 Stipulation : Reply to ECF No. 100 Response re ECF No. 97 Motion for Summary Judgment due by 2/19/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER granting ECF No. 101 BANA"s Stipulation for Extension of Time to respond to ECF No. 98 Rainbow Bend Homeowners Association's Motion for Summary Judgment. BANA's response due by 2/19/2018. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER that the clerk of court is directed to serve a copy of this certification order on the Nevada Attorney General (mailed to AG 12/08/2016). Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER denying 49 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 1/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER denying without prejudice 27 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 11/19/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GMAT Legal Title Trust 2013-1, by U.S. Bank v. Fitchner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James W. Fitchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainbow Bend Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norene M. Vickers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra A. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GMAT Legal Title Trust 2013-1, by U.S. Bank, National Association as Legal Title Trustee
Represented By: Benjamin D. Petiprin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?