OOIDA Risk Retention Group v. Burts et al
Plaintiff: OOIDA Risk Retention Group
Defendant: Marc A. Bordeaux and Robert M. Burts
Counter Claimant: Robert M. Burts
Counter Defendant: OOIDA Risk Retention Group
Case Number: 3:2015cv00081
Filed: February 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER denying 131 OOIDA's Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/22/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER denying ECF No. 164 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER denying 151 motion for immediate status conference. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 4/13/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER approving ECF No. 128 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel. Attorney Jonathan Kandel terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER denying as moot 122 Stipulation to extend time to file response briefs to defendant Robert M. Burt's motion for partial summary judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 11-14-16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to stay and for immediate status conference (ECF Nos. 108 & 110 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: 1. Plaintiff's motion to stay all pending deadlines in this case is GRANTED; 2. Plaint iff's motion for an immediate hearing is DENIED; however, the parties shall file briefs on this matter as follows: a. On or before Monday, October 3, 2016, plaintiff shall file an opening brief including point and authorities on the status of the case and the effect of the stipulation vacating the state court judgment filed September 6, 2016; b. Defendants shall file a response no later than Friday, October 14, 2016; and c. A reply is due on Wednesday, October 26, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 9/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion to Compel. Please see order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DN)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OOIDA Risk Retention Group v. Burts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc A. Bordeaux
Represented By: Thomas R Brennan
Represented By: Mark C. Wenzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Burts
Represented By: Thomas R Brennan
Represented By: Scott A Glogovac
Represented By: Sean P. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Robert M. Burts
Represented By: Thomas R Brennan
Represented By: Scott A Glogovac
Represented By: Sean P. Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: OOIDA Risk Retention Group
Represented By: Jonathan Kandel
Represented By: Scott McMickle
Represented By: Marsha L. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OOIDA Risk Retention Group
Represented By: Jonathan Kandel
Represented By: Scott McMickle
Represented By: Marsha L. Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?