Sampson v. Director N.D.O.P.
Plaintiff: Willie Sampson
Defendant: Director, Nevada Department of Corrections
Case Number: 3:2015cv00082
Filed: February 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 28:1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - The # 13 Motion for voluntary dismissal is granted. The # 5 Application to proceed in forma pauperis is denied as moot. This action is dismissed in its entirety without prejudice. Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 6/8/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 motion for reconsideration. Amended complaint due within 30 days. Clerk shall send to Plaintiff complaint form, instructions, copy of original complaint 9 , declaration 5 -2, and screening order 8 (all papers to be mailed 5/18/15). Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 5/15/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
February 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Clerk shall send Plaintiff IFP application form with instructions. Fully complete IFP application or filing fee due within 30 days. Plaintiff shall submit complaint to this Court within 30 days. Clerk shall send to Plaintiff complaint form with instructions. Clerk shall also send Plaintiff copy of his motion for emergency declaratory judgment 1 -1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 2/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sampson v. Director N.D.O.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Sampson
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?