Sanchez v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Amadeo Sanchez
Defendant: Cert Adams, Renee Baker, James Bruffy, Nevada Department of Corrections and Nevada, State Of
Case Number: 3:2015cv00144
Filed: March 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER dismissing this action for failure to comply with 24 Order and denying as moot 22 motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER denying as moot 1 IFP application; directing Plaintiff to file updated address by 4/1/2016; directing Plaintiff, by 4/1/2016, to file complete IFP application or pay full $400 filing fee; directing Clerk to send this order, IFP fo rm and instructions to address on file for Plaintiff as well as to additional address specified (mailed 3/10/2016); staying action pending Plaintiff's compliance or non-compliance with this order. The Court will issue a subsequent order after 4/1/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 3/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 3/7/2016, granting 20 Motion to Withdraw. Motion to Dismiss 18 is withdrawn. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanchez v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cert Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Bruffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada, State Of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amadeo Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?