Keppel Properties, LLC v. Resurgam Equity Investments, LLC
Plaintiff: Keppel Properties, LLC
Defendant: Resurgam Equity Investments, LLC
Case Number: 3:2015cv00165
Filed: March 18, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting ECF No. 52 Motion to Substitute Attorney. F. DeArmond Sharp and Cody M. Oldham substituted in place and stead of Christopher H. Byrd for Plaintiff Keppel Properties. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER denying ECF No. 41 Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 11/07/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER - Keppel Properties, LLC's motion for leave to file a reply brief (ECF No. 35 ) is granted. Keppel Properties, LLC shall file its brief on or before May 15, 2017. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/9/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Keppel Properties, LLC v. Resurgam Equity Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keppel Properties, LLC
Represented By: Christopher H. Byrd
Represented By: Matthew Peter Digesti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgam Equity Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?