Montgomery v. Airline Professionals Association, International Brotherhood
Plaintiff: David Montgomery
Defendant: Airline Professionals Association, International Brotherhood and The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2015cv00178
Filed: March 25, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05:704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - No objection has been filed. Accordingly, pursuant to the 19 notice of settlement, this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM) Modified on 9/30/2015 to add hyperlink (DRM).
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER This action will be dismissed with prejudice pursuant to the notice of settlement unless either party files an objection on or before September 29, 2015. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 9/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
July 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER - The # 12 Stipulation to extend the deadline for the Rule 16 hearing GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The case management conference set for August 4, 2015 is hereby VACATED. However, the request for a stay of this case until the motion to dismiss is decided is DENIED without prejudice. One or both of the parties shall have leave to file a fully briefed motion to stay on or before August 7, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 7/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Montgomery v. Airline Professionals Association, International Brotherhood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airline Professionals Association, International Brotherhood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Montgomery
Represented By: Nicole M. Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?