Mattson et al v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Roman Borisov and Heather Mattson
Defendant: Daniel G. Bogden, Al Gallmann, Eric H. Holder, Jr., Jeh Johnson and Jeanne Kent
Case Number: 3:2015cv00182
Filed: March 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting ECF No. 78 Unopposed Motion to Substitute Attorney Anthony D. Bianco in for Attorney Hans H. Chen on behalf of defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting Defendants' ECF No. 62 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Plaintiffs' ECF No. 64 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 9/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER approving ECF No. 56 Stipulation to Extend Briefing Scheduled (First Request). Motions for Summary Judgment due by 3/27/2017. Responses/Oppositions to MSJ due by 5/15/2017. Replies in Support of MSJ due by 6/12/2017. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 03/07/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER denying ECF No. 53 Motion for Reconsideration; granting ECF No. 54 Motion to Extend Time - motions for summary judgment may be re-filed within 30 days; substituting John F. Kelly for Jeh Johnson, and substituting Jeff Sessions for Loretta E. Lynch. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER that Plaintiffs' Motion for Rule 11Sanctions ECF No. 46 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 43 and Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 44 are DENIE D without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties may re-file their motions for summary judgment within 30 days of the date of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to the parties stipulation ECF No. 47 , the parties ma y file a response to the re-filed motions for summary judgment within 30 days of each motion being re-filed and may then file a reply within 30 days of the responses. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 02/10/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting Defendants' 20 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' FOIA claim, dismissing with prejudice Plaintiffs' FOIA claim from the First Amended Complaint; denying as moot Defendants' 21 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot Plaintiffs' 22 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot Plaintiffs' 31 Motion to Amend. Signed by Judge Larry R. Hicks on 2/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
December 31, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Compel. Please see attached for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 12/31/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mattson et al v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel G. Bogden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Al Gallmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric H. Holder, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeh Johnson
Represented By: Holly A. Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Borisov
Represented By: Roman Borisov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Mattson
Represented By: Roman Borisov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?