Boney v. Smith et al
Petitioner: |
William D. Boney |
Respondent: |
Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Gregory Smith |
Case Number: |
3:2015cv00193 |
Filed: |
April 2, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Reno Office |
Presiding Judge: |
William G. Cobb |
Presiding Judge: |
Miranda M. Du |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 1, 2018 |
Filing
34
ORDER that this action is dismissed without prejudice; Clerk directed to enter judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/1/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
January 8, 2018 |
Filing
31
ORDER re ECF No. 30 Notice. Clerk directed to update petitioner's address on docket and send petitioner a copy of ECF No. 26 Order. Petitioner will have until 2/5/2018 to respond to order. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/8/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
January 4, 2018 |
Filing
28
ORDER re ECF No. 27 Returned Mail from ESP addressed to petitioner. Respondents are to provide petitioner's current address by 1/14/2018. If petitioner's address is not available to respondents and petitioner fails to update his address then this action will be dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
December 15, 2017 |
Filing
26
ORDER that ECF No. 24 Motion for Stay and Abeyance is denied; petitioner will have until 1/14/18 to respond to order or this action will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 12/15/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
|
February 21, 2017 |
Filing
20
ORDER - ECF No. 10 Motion to dismiss is granted as follows : 1. Ground 1(k) is dismissed with prejudice because it fails to state a cognizable federal habeas corpus claim. 2. Grounds 1(a), 1(b), 1(c), 1(d), 1(e), and 1(f) are unexhausted. Petitioner shall file sworn declaration or motion re exhaustion/abandoment/stay by 3/23/2017. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
|
October 22, 2015 |
Filing
5
ORDER IFP application 1 is granted. Clerk will file and electronically serve petition 1 -1 upon respondents (served via NEF 10/22/2015). Clerk shall add AG to docket. Respondents will have 45 days to answer or otherwise respond. Hard c opy of state court record exhibits must be forwarded to staff attorneys in Reno. Motion for appointment of counsel 1 -2 is denied. Henceforth, petitioner must serve upon AG copy of every pleading, motion, or other document submitted to the Court. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 10/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?