Green Tree Servicing LLC v. William Won Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Defendant: William Won Holdings, LLC and Wingfield Springs Community Association
Case Number: 3:2015cv00197
Filed: April 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Howard D. McKibben
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Petition to Quiet Title
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER that Ditech's alternative motion to enter final judgment on all claims ECF No. 130 is GRANTED; final judgment to be entered in Ditech's favor on its fourth cause of action and on all of defendant William Won Holdings, LLC's claims; all other claims are dismissed as moot without prejudice. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER that partial judgment shall be entered in favor of the plaintiff and against the defendants on plaintiff's fourth cause of action in its amended complaint (ECF No. 67 ). Defendant William Won Holdings, LLC, interest in the subject property known as 2400 Dodge Drive, Sparks, NV 89436 is therefore subject to Fannie Mae's deed of trust. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting ECF No. 115 Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply to ECF No. 101 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Replies due by 12/1/2017. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 11/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting ECF No. 107 Stipulation: Response to ECF No. 101 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment due by 10/27/17. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 10/25/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BLG)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER - Plaintiff's motion to partially lift the stay (ECF No. 99 ) is GRANTED IN PART. The stay of all proceedings entered by the court on February 17, 2017, is hereby VACATED. Plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgmen t (ECF No. 98 ), filed without leave of court and before the stay was lifted, is hereby STRICKEN. Dispositive motions by any party in this case shall be filed no later than September 25, 2017. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 8/23/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting ECF No. 96 Motion to Stay : This action is hereby stayed as to all proceedings until the Bourne Valley case has become final, or until further order of the court. The parties shall advise the court when the Bourne Valley decision becomes final. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 2/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER that the clerk of court is directed to serve a copy of this certification order on the Nevada Attorney General (mailed 12/09/2016). Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 12/08/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER granting ECF No. 86 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Angius & Terry, LLP in place and stead of Chris Yergensen, Esq. on behalf of Wingfield Springs Community Association. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER denying ECF No. 57 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 5/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER denying 25 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 11/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Stipulation to file First Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 6/17/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Tree Servicing LLC v. William Won Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Won Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wingfield Springs Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?