Hall v. Yup
Plaintiff: Damian D. Hall
Defendant: Dr. Gene Yup
Case Number: 3:2015cv00242
Filed: April 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER that the Magistrate Judge's Reports and Recommendation ECF No. 95 is ADOPTED AND ACCEPTED; Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 81 is GRANTED; Clerk directed to enter judgment and close this case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting ECF No. 92 Motion to Extend Time re ECF No. 81 Motion for Summary Judgment: Reply due by 12/7/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 11/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 9/18/2017. Plaintiff's motion (ECF No. 75 ) is GRANTED : Defendants shall provide plaintiff copies of the documents attached to their supplemental notice (ECF NO. 72 ) no later than Friday, September 22, 2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke, on 8/8/2017. Defendant's motion for clarification ECF No. 70 is GRANTED. See order regarding procedures concerning conflicts in scheduling mediations and settlement conferences for incarcerated plaintiffs. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER - ECF No. 4 IFP Application is GRANTED. NDOC shall pay Clerk from inmate account. Clerk shall SEND Finance and Inmate Services a copy of this order. (E-service (NEF) to Finance; copy mailed to NDOC 5/26/2016.) Clerk shall SERVE this order a nd ECF No. 9 Amended complaint on AG. (E-service 5/26/2016; Amended complaint via NEF regeneration.) AG shall file notice re acceptance of service by 6/16/2016, or addresses under seal for Ds for which service not accepted. P shall file a motion re unserved Ds. If service accepted then Answer/response due by 7/25/2016. Henceforth P shall serve Ds a copy of every pleading submitted for consideration together with a certificate of service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 5/26/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Yup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damian D. Hall
Represented By: c/o Librarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gene Yup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?