Martinez et al v. MXI Corp et al
Plaintiff: Enrique Martinez, Michelle Martinez and Sunshine Martinez-Valdez
Defendant: Andrew Brooks, Jeanette L Brooks, Martin J Brooks, Sandy Chambers, Kerry Dean, Paul Engemann, Suzanne Engemann, Adam Paul Green, Melannie Green, Felix Gudino, Lisa Gudino, Connie Hollstein, MXI Corp, Ian Murray, Judy Murray, Glen Overton, Kim Overton, Dr. Gordon Pedersen, Paula Pritchard, Jeremy Reynolds, Karen Reynolds, Kathleen Robbins, Ruth Smith, Sherman Smith, Carolyn Swaby, William "Butch" Swaby, Derrick Winkel and Naomi Winkel
Case Number: 3:2015cv00243
Filed: May 1, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: Valerie P. Cooke
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION COSTS, AND SERVICE AWARDS - 1. Class Counsel are awarded attorneys fees in the amount of $1,561,091.43; 2. Class Counsel are awarded reimbursement of their unreim bursed costs and expenses in the amount of $38,908.57; 3. The Named Representatives are awarded $35,000.00 in service awards, to be distributed as follows: Enrique Martinez - $10,000 Michelle Martinez - $10,000 Sunshine Martinez-Valdez - $5,000 Beckie Lobb - $5,000 Paula Wilson - $5,000 4. The attorneys fees, reimbursement of expenses, and service awards will be paid from the Settlement Fund at the time described in the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 2/28/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Scheduling Fairness Hearing, Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Conditionally Certifying the Settlement Class, and Providing for Notice. Fairness Hearing set for 2/27/2017 at 10:00 AM in Reno Courtroom 5 before Judge Miranda M. Du. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 11/21/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER granting ECF No. 151 Stipulation : Pritchard Defendants' Answer/Response to ECF No. 140 Complaint due 15 days from Court's denial of Plaintiff's motion for Preliminary or final approval of the settlement agreement. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/31/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER granting ECF No. 138 Stipulation Regarding Non-Waiver of Privileges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 8/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER approving 100 Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 3/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER - Defendants' motions to dismiss (## 50 , 54 , 57 ) are granted with respect to counts III and IV. Counts III and IV are dismissed without prejudice. It is further ordered that Defendants' motions to dismiss are granted with respect to count II against individual defendants Carolyn Swaby, Lisa Gudino, Kim Overton, Karen Reynolds, Naomi Winkel, Suzanne Engemann, and Melanie Green. Plaintiffs may file an amended complaint within 15 days of this Order if they so choose. If Plaintiffs fail to amend their Complaint, this case will proceed on the counts that survive dismissal. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 3/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying Defendants' 79 Motion to Stay. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie P. Cooke on 12/8/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez et al v. MXI Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Brooks
Represented By: Brian A. Howie
Represented By: Nathan M. Jenkins
Represented By: Kevin D. Quigley
Represented By: Edward A. Salanga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanette L Brooks
Represented By: Brian A. Howie
Represented By: Nathan M. Jenkins
Represented By: Kevin D. Quigley
Represented By: Edward A. Salanga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin J Brooks
Represented By: Brian A. Howie
Represented By: Nathan M. Jenkins
Represented By: Kevin D. Quigley
Represented By: Edward A. Salanga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerry Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Engemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suzanne Engemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Paul Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melannie Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix Gudino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Gudino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Hollstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MXI Corp
Represented By: Brian A. Howie
Represented By: Nathan M. Jenkins
Represented By: Kevin D. Quigley
Represented By: Edward A. Salanga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ian Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judy Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glen Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Overton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Gordon Pedersen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paula Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Reynolds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruth Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherman Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Swaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William "Butch" Swaby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick Winkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi Winkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Enrique Martinez
Represented By: Justin J. Bustos
Represented By: John Desmond
Represented By: J Benjamin King
Represented By: Randall Adam Swick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Martinez
Represented By: Justin J. Bustos
Represented By: John Desmond
Represented By: J Benjamin King
Represented By: Randall Adam Swick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunshine Martinez-Valdez
Represented By: Justin J. Bustos
Represented By: John Desmond
Represented By: J Benjamin King
Represented By: Randall Adam Swick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?