Curry v. Colvin
Plaintiff: John Curry
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin and Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Case Number: 3:2015cv00244
Filed: May 3, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Larry R. Hicks
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER that Plaintiff shall be awarded attorney fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act (EAJA), 28 U.S.C §2412(d), in the amount of $4,753.57, subject to the terms of the Stipulation. Under the terms of the Stipulation, payment may be delivered to Plaintiff's counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 06/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 4/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
January 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING # 15 Motion for Extension of Time : Response to # 12 Motion to Remand due by 1/20/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 1/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb, on 12/7/2015, granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to 12 Motion to Remand to Agency. Responses due by 1/6/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curry v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration Office of General Counsel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Curry
Represented By: Nicole K Steinhaus
Represented By: Leonard H Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?