Green Tree Servicing LLC v. Rainbow Bend Homeowners Association et al
Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Defendant: Daniel Hall, Diana Hall and Rainbow Bend Homeowners Association
Case Number: 3:2015cv00297
Filed: June 4, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Reno Office
Presiding Judge: William G. Cobb
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Petition to Quiet Ti
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER that Plaintiff Green Tree's Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 58 is granted. The Court finds that the HOA foreclosure sale did not extinguish Plaintiff's DOT, which continues to encumber the Property. The Clerk is instructed to enter judgment in favor of Green Tree on its quiet title claim and close this case. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 09/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER lifting temporary stay. Pending motions that were denied without prejudice when the stay was imposed may be refiled within 30 days. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 1/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER staying case pending the Ninth Circuit's issuance of the mandate in Bourne Valley Court Trust v. Wells Fargo Bank. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 8/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 18 motion to dismiss or in the alternative for summary judgment and granting in part and denying in part 30 motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Miranda M. Du on 4/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC) (Main Document 47 replaced on 4/12/2016) (JC).
October 5, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - Plaintiff's ## 7 , 8 Motions are GRANTED IN PART and Plaintiff may have an extension of 120 days, up to and including February 1, 2016, in which to serve Defendants Daniel Hall and Diana Hall. Signed by Magistrate Judge William G. Cobb on 10/5/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green Tree Servicing LLC v. Rainbow Bend Homeowners Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Green Tree Servicing LLC
Represented By: Colt B. Dodrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diana Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainbow Bend Homeowners Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?